EP1186162 - MULTI-MODAL VIDEO TARGET ACQUISITION AND RE-DIRECTION SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.06.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.07.2014 [2014/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2013/39] |
Former [2013/31] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2002/11] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COHEN-SOLAL, Eric Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
LEE, Mi-Suen Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2002/11] | Representative(s) | Damen, Daniel Martijn, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2013/31] | Damen, Daniel Martijn, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2007/01] | Damen, Daniel Martijn, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2002/11] | White, Andrew Gordon, et al Philips Corporate Intellectual Property, Cross Oak Lane Redhill, #Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 01905655.5 | 08.01.2001 | [2002/11] | WO2001EP00120 | Priority number, date | US20000488028 | 20.01.2000 Original published format: US 488028 | [2002/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0154399 | Date: | 26.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/30] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1186162 | Date: | 13.03.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.07.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1186162 | Date: | 31.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/00 | [2002/11] | CPC: |
G06V10/255 (EP,US);
H04N23/66 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/20] |
Former [2002/11] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | MULTI-MODAL VIDEOZIELERFASSUNG UND RICHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN | [2002/11] | English: | MULTI-MODAL VIDEO TARGET ACQUISITION AND RE-DIRECTION SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2002/11] | French: | SYSTEME MULTIMODE DE REORIENTATION ET D'ACQUISITION DE CIBLE VIDEO ET PROCEDE | [2002/11] | Entry into regional phase | 22.10.2001 | National basic fee paid | 27.06.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.06.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/35] | 03.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 11.10.2011 | 03.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.10.2011 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 09.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.01.2007 | Opposition(s) | 02.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 01.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 31.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]WO9708896 (SCIENTIFIC ATLANTA [US], et al) [X] 1,12-14 * page 4, line 10 - page 5, line 33 * * page 9, line 25 - line 30 * * page 11, line 3 - line 12 * * page 19, line 19 - page 20, line 30 * * page 22, line 14 - page 23, line 2 * [A] 5-11; | [A]DE19639728 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,11-14 * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 20 * * figure . *; | [DA] - MASAAKI FUKUMOTO ET AL, "FINGER-POINTER: POINTING INTERFACE BY IMAGE PROCESSING", COMPUTERS AND GRAPHICS,PERGAMON PRESS LTD. OXFORD,GB, (19940901), vol. 18, no. 5, ISSN 0097-8493, pages 633 - 642, XP000546603 [DA] 1-7,11-13 * page 633, column L - page 634, column R * * page 637, column L - page 639, column R * * figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0097-8493(94)90157-0 | Examination | US5844599 | WO9934276 | - HOWELL J ET AL, "Learning gestures for visually mediated interaction", PROCEEDINGS OF THE BRITISH MACHINE VISION CONFERENCE, XX, XX, (19981001), pages 508 - 517, XP008123236 | - BOLT R A ET AL, "TWO-HANDED GESTURE IN MULTI-MODAL NATURAL DIALOG", UIST '92. 5TH ANNUAL SYMPOSIUM ON USER INTERFACE SOFTWARE AND TECHNOLOGY. PROCEEDINGS OF THE ACM SYMPOSIUM ON USER INTERFACE SOFTWARE AND TECHNOLOGY. MONTEREY, NOV. 15 - 18, 1992; [ACM SYMPOSIUM ON USER INTERFACE SOFTWARE AND TECHNOLOGY], NEW YORK, N, (19921115), doi:10.1145/142621.142623, ISBN 978-0-89791-549-6, pages 7 - 14, XP000337546 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/142621.142623 | by applicant | US5187574 | WO9708896 | US5844599 | - MASAAKI FUKUMOTO; YASUHITO SUENGA; KENJI MASE, FINGER-POINTER': POINTING INTERFACE BY IMAGE PROCESSING |