EP1264144 - WINDOW FOR A HOT CHAMBER THAT IS SEALED OFF FROM THE SURROUNDINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
FR
Schott AG Hattenbergstrasse 10 55122 Mainz / DE | [2004/46] |
Former [2004/17] | For:DE
FR
Schott Glas Hattenbergstrasse 10 55122 Mainz / DE | ||
Former [2002/50] | For:AT
BE
CH
CY
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GR
IT
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
TR
Schott Glas Hattenbergstrasse 10 55122 Mainz / DE | ||
For:GB
IE
CARL-ZEISS-STIFTUNG trading as SCHOTT GLAS Hattenbergstrasse 10 55122 Mainz / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GROS, Oliver Kleinweidelbach 21 55494 Rheinböllen / FR | 02 /
LEUTNER, Kurt Am Schinnergraben 81 55129 Mainz / DE | [2002/50] | Representative(s) | Fuchs Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 46 60 65036 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Fuchs Patentanwälte Postfach 46 60 65036 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [2002/50] | Fuchs Mehler Weiss & Fritzsche Patentanwälte Postfach 46 60 65036 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 01905762.9 | 10.02.2001 | [2002/50] | WO2001EP01475 | Priority number, date | DE2000112577 | 15.03.2000 Original published format: DE 10012577 | [2002/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0169137 | Date: | 20.09.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1264144 | Date: | 11.12.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.09.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1264144 | Date: | 15.09.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F24C15/04 | [2002/50] | CPC: |
F24C15/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2004/38] |
Former [2002/50] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SICHTFENSTER FÜR EINEN VON DER UMGEBUNG ABGESCHLOSSENEN HEISSRAUM | [2002/50] | English: | WINDOW FOR A HOT CHAMBER THAT IS SEALED OFF FROM THE SURROUNDINGS | [2002/50] | French: | FENETRE D'OBSERVATION POUR CHAMBRE CHAUDE ISOLEE DE L'ENVIRONNEMENT | [2002/50] | Entry into regional phase | 07.08.2002 | National basic fee paid | 07.08.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.08.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.09.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/50] | 09.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE19802688 (AEG HAUSGERAETE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-4,6* figure -; claims 1-13 * | by applicant | DE3637064 | DE3915687 | EP0646753 | EP0731318 |