EP1257751 - FRICTION CLUTCH, ESPECIALLY A TORQUE CONVERTER LOCKUP CLUTCH FOR A HYDRODYNAMIC TORQUE CONVERTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.05.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.06.2004 [2004/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZF Friedrichshafen AG Graf-von-Soden-Platz 1 88046 Friedrichshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/47] | For all designated states ZF FRIEDRICHSHAFEN Aktiengesellschaft 88038 Friedrichshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRANDERATH, Paul Schachenstrasse 15 88074 Meckenbeuren / DE | [2002/47] | Application number, filing date | 01905787.6 | 17.02.2001 | [2002/47] | WO2001EP01768 | Priority number, date | DE2000108167 | 23.02.2000 Original published format: DE 10008167 | [2002/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0163149 | Date: | 30.08.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1257751 | Date: | 20.11.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1257751 | Date: | 09.07.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F16H45/02 | [2002/47] | CPC: |
F16H45/02 (EP,US);
F16H2045/0289 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE [2003/28] |
Former [2002/47] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | REIBKUPPLUNG, INSBESONDERE WANDLERÜBERBRÜCKUNGSKUPPLUNG FÜR EINEN HYDRODYNAMISCHEN DREHMOMENTWANDLER | [2002/47] | English: | FRICTION CLUTCH, ESPECIALLY A TORQUE CONVERTER LOCKUP CLUTCH FOR A HYDRODYNAMIC TORQUE CONVERTER | [2002/47] | French: | EMBRAYAGE A FRICTION, EN PARTICULIER EMBRAYAGE DE PONTAGE DE CONVERTISSEUR DESTINE A UN CONVERTISSEUR DE COUPLE HYDRODYNAMIQUE | [2002/47] | Entry into regional phase | 14.08.2002 | National basic fee paid | 14.08.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.08.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.07.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/47] | 14.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 08.05.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0819863 (VALEO [FR]) [X] 1,2,4,8,9,13,14,19 * column 1, line 55 - column 2, line 51 * * column 5, line 24 - line 44 * * column 6, line 3 - line 20 * * figures 6-9 *; | [X]JPH07145858 ; | [PX]DE10009576 (MANNESMANN SACHS AG [DE]) [PX] 1,2,7,9,11-15,19 * figures 15-30 *; | [PX]JP2000329212 ; | [A]US5566802 (KIRKWOOD MALCOLM E [US]) [A] 1,14 * column 6, line 13 - line 34 * * figures 8,10 *; | [A]DE19714563 (MANNESMANN SACHS AG [DE]) [A] 1,14 * column 3, line 18 - line 38 * * figure 2 *; | [A]DE4302773 (DYNAX CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * figure 7 *; | [A]DE19622593 (FICHTEL & SACHS AG [DE]) [A] 1 * column 5, line 12 - column 6, line 21 * * figure 4 *; | [DA]DE4420959 (LUK GETRIEBE SYSTEME GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1 * figures 6-8 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951031), vol. 1995, no. 09, & JP07145858 A 19950606 (NISSAN MOTOR CO LTD) [X] 1,2,9,11,14,15,19 * abstract * * paragraphs [0048] , [0049] * * figures 9B,9C * | [PX] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010305), vol. 2000, no. 14, & JP2000329212 A 20001130 (TOYOTA CENTRAL RES & DEV LAB INC;TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [PX] 1-3,7-9,11,14,15,19 * abstract * * figures 2,4,5 * |