EP1261861 - ELECTROCHEMICAL SENSOR FOR DETERMINING BLOOD CLOTTING, CORRESPONDING SYSTEM FOR MEASURING BLOOD CLOTTING AND METHOD FOR DETERMINING BLOOD CLOTTING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.08.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | For:AT
BE
CH
CY
DK
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
TR
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2003/31] | For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH 68298 Mannheim / DE | ||
For:AT
BE
CH
CY
DK
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
TR
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | |||
Former [2003/13] | For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH 68298 Mannheim / DE | ||
For:AT
CY
ES
GB
IT
NL
TR
BE
FI
GR
LU
PT
CH
DK
FR
IE
MC
SE
F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE AG 124 Grenzacherstrasse 4070 Basel / CH | |||
Former [2002/49] | For all designated states F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE AG 124 Grenzacherstrasse 4070 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UNKRIG, Volker Stahlbuehlring 27 68526 Ladenburg / DE | 02 /
MARQUANT, Michael Ida-Dehmel-Ring 84 68309 Mannheim / DE | 03 /
HINDELANG, Fritz Kurweg 74 67316 Carlsberg / DE | 04 /
KOTZAN, Holger Breslauer Str. 77 68526 Ladenburg / DE | 05 /
HORN, Carina Alte Bergstrasse 91 64665 Alsbach-Haehnlein / DE | 06 /
NORTMEYER, Christine Kettelerweg 6 68305 Mannheim / DE | [2002/49] | Representative(s) | Jung, Michael Roche Diagnostics GmbH Patentabteilung Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/49] | Jung, Michael, Dr. Roche Diagnostics GmbH Patentabteilung 68298 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 01905800.7 | 19.02.2001 | [2002/49] | WO2001EP01848 | Priority number, date | DE2000107910 | 21.02.2000 Original published format: DE 10007910 | US20000184059P | 22.02.2000 Original published format: US 184059 P | DE2000116775 | 04.04.2000 Original published format: DE 10016775 | [2002/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0163271 | Date: | 30.08.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1261861 | Date: | 04.12.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1261861 | Date: | 29.09.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/327, G01N33/86, C12Q1/00 | [2002/49] | CPC: |
C12Q1/005 (EP);
G01N33/86 (EP);
G01N2333/974 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/49] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTROCHEMISCHER SENSOR ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER BLUTGERINNUNG, EIN ENTSPRECHENDES BLUTGERINNUNGSMESSSYSTEM SOWIE EIN VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER BLUTGERINNUNG | [2002/49] | English: | ELECTROCHEMICAL SENSOR FOR DETERMINING BLOOD CLOTTING, CORRESPONDING SYSTEM FOR MEASURING BLOOD CLOTTING AND METHOD FOR DETERMINING BLOOD CLOTTING | [2002/49] | French: | CAPTEUR ELECTROCHIMIQUE PERMETTANT DE DETERMINER LA COAGULATION SANGUINE, SYSTEME CORRESPONDANT DE MESURE DE LA COAGULATION SANGUINE ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE DETERMINER LA COAGULATION SANGUINE | [2002/49] | Entry into regional phase | 23.09.2002 | National basic fee paid | 23.09.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.09.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.06.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/49] | 01.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 29.09.2004 | FR | 29.09.2004 | GB | 29.09.2004 | IE | 29.09.2004 | IT | 29.09.2004 | NL | 29.09.2004 | TR | 29.09.2004 | DK | 29.12.2004 | GR | 29.12.2004 | SE | 29.12.2004 | ES | 09.01.2005 | AT | 19.02.2005 | CY | 19.02.2005 | LU | 19.02.2005 | BE | 28.02.2005 | CH | 28.02.2005 | LI | 28.02.2005 | MC | 28.02.2005 | PT | 28.02.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/36] | FI | 29.09.2004 | |
FR | 29.09.2004 | ||
GB | 29.09.2004 | ||
IE | 29.09.2004 | ||
IT | 29.09.2004 | ||
NL | 29.09.2004 | ||
TR | 29.09.2004 | ||
DK | 29.12.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
ES | 09.01.2005 | ||
AT | 19.02.2005 | ||
CY | 19.02.2005 | ||
LU | 19.02.2005 | ||
BE | 28.02.2005 | ||
CH | 28.02.2005 | ||
LI | 28.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | FI | 29.09.2004 | |
FR | 29.09.2004 | ||
GB | 29.09.2004 | ||
IE | 29.09.2004 | ||
NL | 29.09.2004 | ||
TR | 29.09.2004 | ||
DK | 29.12.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
ES | 09.01.2005 | ||
AT | 19.02.2005 | ||
CY | 19.02.2005 | ||
LU | 19.02.2005 | ||
BE | 28.02.2005 | ||
CH | 28.02.2005 | ||
LI | 28.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2007/10] | FI | 29.09.2004 | |
FR | 29.09.2004 | ||
GB | 29.09.2004 | ||
IE | 29.09.2004 | ||
NL | 29.09.2004 | ||
TR | 29.09.2004 | ||
DK | 29.12.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
ES | 09.01.2005 | ||
AT | 19.02.2005 | ||
LU | 19.02.2005 | ||
BE | 28.02.2005 | ||
CH | 28.02.2005 | ||
LI | 28.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 29.09.2004 | |
FR | 29.09.2004 | ||
GB | 29.09.2004 | ||
IE | 29.09.2004 | ||
NL | 29.09.2004 | ||
TR | 29.09.2004 | ||
DK | 29.12.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
ES | 09.01.2005 | ||
AT | 19.02.2005 | ||
BE | 28.02.2005 | ||
CH | 28.02.2005 | ||
LI | 28.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2006/34] | FI | 29.09.2004 | |
FR | 29.09.2004 | ||
GB | 29.09.2004 | ||
IE | 29.09.2004 | ||
NL | 29.09.2004 | ||
DK | 29.12.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
ES | 09.01.2005 | ||
AT | 19.02.2005 | ||
BE | 28.02.2005 | ||
CH | 28.02.2005 | ||
LI | 28.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2006/32] | FI | 29.09.2004 | |
FR | 29.09.2004 | ||
GB | 29.09.2004 | ||
IE | 29.09.2004 | ||
NL | 29.09.2004 | ||
DK | 29.12.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
ES | 09.01.2005 | ||
BE | 28.02.2005 | ||
CH | 28.02.2005 | ||
LI | 28.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 29.09.2004 | |
GB | 29.09.2004 | ||
IE | 29.09.2004 | ||
NL | 29.09.2004 | ||
DK | 29.12.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
ES | 09.01.2005 | ||
BE | 28.02.2005 | ||
CH | 28.02.2005 | ||
LI | 28.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 29.09.2004 | |
GB | 29.09.2004 | ||
IE | 29.09.2004 | ||
NL | 29.09.2004 | ||
DK | 29.12.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
ES | 09.01.2005 | ||
BE | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 29.09.2004 | |
IE | 29.09.2004 | ||
DK | 29.12.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
ES | 09.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/27] | FI | 29.09.2004 | |
IE | 29.09.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
ES | 09.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 29.09.2004 | |
IE | 29.09.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | FI | 29.09.2004 | |
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 29.09.2004 | |
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | SE | 29.12.2004 | Cited in | International search | [AD]US4304853 (JOZEFONVICZ MARCEL, et al) [AD] 1-16 * column A * * column 1, line 56 - column 3, line 14; example IX *; | [A]WO9839643 (DIAMETRICS [US]) [A] 1-16* page 2, paragraph 2 - page 4, line 21 *; | [PX]EP1031830 (ASULAB SA [CH]) [PX] 1-16 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 2 * * page 5, line 1 - line 43 *; | [X] - ARWIN, HANS ET AL, "Thrombin activity measured with a new electric method", FEBS LETT. (1976), 64(1), 95-7, XP000995397 [X] 1-16 * page 95, column L, paragraph 2 - column R, paragraph 1 * * page 95, column R, paragraph L * * page 96, column R, paragraph 2 * * page 97, column R * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0014-5793(76)80258-X | [X] - RANDRIAMABAZAKA, H. N. ET AL, "Voltammetric assay of thrombin adsorbed on the carbon paste electrode.", ELECTROANALYSIS, (1993) VOL. 5, NO. 3, PP. 231-241., XP000995661 [X] 1-16 * abstract * * page 231, column L, paragraph 2 - page 232, column R, paragraph 2 * * page 235, column R, paragraph 3 - page 240, column R, paragraph L * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/elan.1140050308 | [A] - DE PEURIOT, M. DARAIO ET AL, "The electrochemical activity determination of trypsin-like enzymes. V. A comparative study of the electrochemical oxidation of the marker, p-aminodiphenylamine, and of electrogenic substrates in human plasma, whole blood, and aqueous solutions", J. ELECTROCHEM. SOC. (1981), 128(6), 1233-8, XP000995360 [A] 1-16 * page 1233, column L, paragraph 3 - page 1234, column L, paragraph 4 * |