EP1264311 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR WRITING CLOCK DATA TO A STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.01.2005 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.01.2005 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.02.2005 [2005/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states XYRATEX TECHNOLOGY LIMITED Langstone Road Havant, Hampshire PO9 1SA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/50] | For all designated states XYRATEX TECHNOLOGY LIMITED Langstone Road Havant Hampshire PO9 1SA / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miles, Michael Alan 14 Osprey Drive Hayling Island, Hampshire PO11 9BX / GB | [2002/50] | Representative(s) | Flint, Adam Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/50] | Flint, Adam W.H. Beck, Greener & Co., 7 Stone Buildings, Lincoln's Inn London WC2A 3SZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 01905992.2 | 23.02.2001 | [2002/50] | WO2001GB00784 | Priority number, date | US20000187013P | 06.03.2000 Original published format: US 187013 P | [2002/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0167454 | Date: | 13.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1264311 | Date: | 11.12.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.09.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G11B21/10, G11B27/30, G11B20/16, G11B5/55, G11B5/596, G11B21/08 | [2002/50] | CPC: |
G11B21/106 (EP,US);
G11B20/16 (EP,US);
G11B21/083 (EP,US);
G11B21/10 (EP,US);
G11B27/30 (EP,US);
G11B5/59633 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2004/22] |
Former [2002/50] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND GERÄT ZUM AUFSCHREIBEN VON TAKTDATEIEN AUF EIN SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2002/50] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR WRITING CLOCK DATA TO A STORAGE MEDIUM | [2002/50] | French: | MARQUAGE D'UNE PISTE D'HORLOGE SUR UN SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE | [2002/50] | Entry into regional phase | 26.07.2002 | National basic fee paid | 26.07.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.07.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.08.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/50] | 24.12.2004 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DX]WO9831015 (HAVANT INTERNATIONAL LTD [GB], et al) [DX] 1,4-7 * the whole document *; | [A] - "REGENERATIVE CLOCK TECHNIQUE FOR SERVO TRACK WRITERS", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN,US,IBM CORP. NEW YORK, (19901001), vol. 33, no. 5, ISSN 0018-8689, pages 310 - 311, XP000107544 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * |