EP1266060 - LAUNDRY APPLIANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.03.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dyson Technology Limited Tetbury Hill Malmesbury Wiltshire SN16 0RP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/06] | For all designated states Dyson Technology Limited Tetbury Hill Malmesbury, Wiltshire SN16 0RP / GB | ||
Former [2002/51] | For all designated states Dyson Limited Tetbury Hill Malmesbury, Wiltshire SN16 0RP / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAWE, Roger Michael 97 Rowe Mead Chippenham, Wiltshire SN15 3YT / GB | [2002/51] | Representative(s) | Cage, John David, et al Dyson Research Limited Intellectual Property Department PO Box 2080 Malmesbury, Wiltshire SN16 0SW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/51] | Cage, John David, et al Dyson Research Limited Intellectual Property Department PO Box 2080 Malmesbury, Wiltshire SN16 0SW / GB | Application number, filing date | 01906019.3 | 27.02.2001 | [2002/51] | WO2001GB00826 | Priority number, date | GB20000006502 | 18.03.2000 Original published format: GB 0006502 | [2002/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0171085 | Date: | 27.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1266060 | Date: | 18.12.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.09.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1266060 | Date: | 11.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | D06F37/20, D06F39/00 | [2002/51] | CPC: |
D06F23/04 (EP,US);
D06F33/48 (EP,US);
D06F34/18 (EP,US);
D06F2103/04 (EP,US);
D06F2103/24 (EP,US);
D06F2103/46 (EP,US);
D06F2105/48 (EP,US);
D06F2105/52 (EP,US);
D06F2105/56 (EP,US);
D06F2105/58 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WÄSCHEREIGERÄT | [2002/51] | English: | LAUNDRY APPLIANCE | [2002/51] | French: | APPAREIL DE BLANCHISSAGE | [2002/51] | Entry into regional phase | 25.09.2002 | National basic fee paid | 25.09.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.09.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.09.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/51] | 23.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 23.02.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.02.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.05.2005 | CH | 11.05.2005 | CY | 11.05.2005 | FI | 11.05.2005 | LI | 11.05.2005 | TR | 11.05.2005 | DK | 11.08.2005 | GR | 11.08.2005 | SE | 11.08.2005 | PT | 19.10.2005 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 11.05.2005 | |
CH | 11.05.2005 | ||
FI | 11.05.2005 | ||
LI | 11.05.2005 | ||
TR | 11.05.2005 | ||
DK | 11.08.2005 | ||
GR | 11.08.2005 | ||
SE | 11.08.2005 | ||
PT | 19.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 11.05.2005 | |
CH | 11.05.2005 | ||
FI | 11.05.2005 | ||
LI | 11.05.2005 | ||
DK | 11.08.2005 | ||
GR | 11.08.2005 | ||
SE | 11.08.2005 | ||
PT | 19.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 11.05.2005 | |
FI | 11.05.2005 | ||
DK | 11.08.2005 | ||
SE | 11.08.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 11.05.2005 | |
SE | 11.08.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | SE | 11.08.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE8905566U (BSG-SCHALTTECHNIK GMBH); | [Y]US5543698 (TAO JINGHAN [US], et al) [Y] 1,5,7-13 * column 5, line 4 - line 50 * * column 9, line 34 - line 54 * * column 9, line 64 - column 10, line 54 * * figures 1,6 *; | [A]GB2322141 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]); | [DY]GB2337274 (NOTETRY LTD [GB]) [DY] 1,5,7-13 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0969133 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1,10-13 * the whole document * |