EP1254031 - CONNECTION OF A WHEEL HUB BEARING UNIT TO A MOTOR VEHICLE SUSPENSION STANDARD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.05.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.05.2004 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.06.2004 [2004/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SKF INDUSTRIE S.p.A. Via Arcivescovado, 1 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2002/45] | For all designated states SKF INDUSTRIE S.P.A. Via Arcivescovado, 1 10121 Torino / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IARRERA, Fabrizio Via Massena, 44 I-10128 Torino / IT | 02 /
PICCA, Mauro Località S. Sebastiano, 26 I-10063 Perosa Argentina / IT | 03 /
BERTETTI, Paolo Lungo Po Antonelli, 163 I-10153 Torino / IT | 04 /
RUETTER, Andreas Weingartenweg 4 97422 Schweinfurt / DE | [2003/06] |
Former [2002/45] | 01 /
IARRERA, Fabrizio Corso Brunelleschi, 121 I-10141 Torino / IT | ||
02 /
PICCA, Mauro Località S. Sebastiano, 26 I-10063 Perosa Argentina / IT | |||
03 /
BERTETTI, Paolo Lungo Po Antonelli, 163 I-10153 Torino / IT | |||
04 /
RUETTER, Andreas Strada del Galoppatoio, 20 I-10064 Pinerolo / IT | Representative(s) | Fioravanti, Corrado, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2002/45] | Fioravanti, Corrado, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A., Corso Regio Parco 27 10152 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 01906101.9 | 25.01.2001 | [2002/45] | WO2001IT00039 | Priority number, date | IT2000PN00084 | 28.01.2000 Original published format: IT PN000084 | [2002/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0154925 | Date: | 02.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1254031 | Date: | 06.11.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B60B27/00, F16C35/067 | [2002/45] | CPC: |
B60B27/0089 (EP,US);
B60B27/00 (EP,KR,US);
F16C19/184 (EP,US);
F16C35/077 (EP,US);
F16C2326/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/22] |
Former [2002/45] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | VERBINDUNG ZWISCHEN EINER RADNABENLAGEREINHEIT UND EINER RADAUFHÄNGUNG EINES FAHRZEUGES | [2002/45] | English: | CONNECTION OF A WHEEL HUB BEARING UNIT TO A MOTOR VEHICLE SUSPENSION STANDARD | [2002/45] | French: | CONNEXION D'UN ROULEMENT DE MOYEU AU BRAS DE SUSPENSION D'UN VEHICULE A MOTEUR | [2002/45] | Entry into regional phase | 27.08.2002 | National basic fee paid | 27.08.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.08.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.08.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/45] | 29.04.2004 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2004/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2003 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   03.02.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]US4203635 (REITER GERHARD [US]) [X] 13 * column 2, line 44 - column 7, line 16; figure - * [A] 12,14; | [A]DE3823442 (FISCHER AG GEORG [CH]) [A] 16 * figure .; claim 1 *; | [A]DE4117334 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 17 * column 4, line 10 - line 40; figure - *; | [A]US5494129 (KRUDE WERNER [DE], et al) [A] 1* abstract *; | [DA]US5782566 (BERTETTI PAOLO [IT]) [DA] 1 * column 4; figure - *; | [A]EP0879972 (SKF IND SPA [IT]) [A] 17 * abstract *; | [X]WO9934126 (VOLVO AB [SE], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6 * page 4, line 2 - page 9, line 16; figures 1-4 * | by applicant | US5782566 |