EP1256133 - Method for fabricating a MOS-gated semiconductor device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/46] | MOS-GATED SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE HAVING ALTERNATING CONDUCTIVITY TYPE SEMICONDUCTOR REGIONS AND METHOD OF MAKING THE SAME | ||
[2010/23] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.11.2011 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.01.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 08.02.2012 [2012/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation 82 Running Hill Road South Portland, ME 04106 / US | [2002/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOCON, Christopher 16 Grace Drive Plains, PA 18705 / US | [2002/46] | Representative(s) | Liesegang, Eva Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/46] | Liesegang, Eva Forrester & Boehmert, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01906781.8 | 30.01.2001 | [2002/46] | WO2001US02964 | Priority number, date | US20000502712 | 11.02.2000 Original published format: US 502712 | [2002/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0159848 | Date: | 16.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/33] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1256133 | Date: | 13.11.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1256133 | Date: | 19.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/336, H01L29/78, H01L29/06, H01L29/10, // H01L21/225 | [2010/23] | CPC: |
H01L29/7802 (EP,US);
H01L21/18 (KR);
H01L29/0634 (EP,US);
H01L29/7813 (EP,US);
H01L29/0649 (EP,US);
H01L29/1095 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/46] | H01L29/78, H01L29/10, H01L29/06, H01L21/336, // (H01L29/739, 29:749) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2004/22] |
Former [2002/46] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer MOS-gesteuerten Halbleiteranordnung | [2010/23] | English: | Method for fabricating a MOS-gated semiconductor device | [2010/23] | French: | Méthode de fabrication d'un dispositif semi-conducteur à commande MOS | [2010/23] |
Former [2002/46] | MOS-GESTEUERTE HALBLEITERANORDNUNG MIT HALBLEITERBEREICHEN ABWECHSELNDEN LEITFÄHIGKEITSTYPS UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG | ||
Former [2002/46] | MOS-GATED SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE HAVING ALTERNATING CONDUCTIVITY TYPE SEMICONDUCTOR REGIONS AND METHOD OF MAKING THE SAME | ||
Former [2002/46] | DISPOSITIFS A DECLENCHEMENT MOS A ALTERNANCE DE ZONES DE CONDUCTIVITE | Entry into regional phase | 30.08.2002 | National basic fee paid | 30.08.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.08.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.09.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/46] | 03.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.11.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 25.11.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.10.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2003 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   03.04.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 21.03.2011 | [2012/06] | Cited in | International search | [X]US5981996 (FUJISHIMA NAOTO [JP]) [X] 1-6 * column 14, line 20 - column 15, line 4; figure 6 *; | [XA]JPH08264772 ; | [DXA]US5216275 (CHEN XINGBI [CN]) [DX] 1,3 * column 5, lines 30-38,49-68; figures 2,4,5 * [A] 4; | [PX]WO0075965 (GEN SEMICONDUCTOR INC [US]) [PX] 1-6 * page 4, line 1 of last paragraph - page 7, line 23; figures 3-7 *; | [PX]WO0068997 (C P CLARE CORP [US]) [PX] 1-5 * page 10, line 29 - page 12, line 20; figure 6 *; | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970228), vol. 1997, no. 02, & JP08264772 A 19961011 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [X] 1,3 * abstract; paragraphs 0030-0039; figures 5,8,9 * [A] 4-6 | [XA] - CHEN X, "THEORY OF A NOVEL VOLTAGE SUSTAINING (CB) LAYER FOR POWER DEVICES", CHINESE JOURNAL OF ELECTRONICS, TECHNOLOGY EXCHANGE LTD, HONG KONG, HK, (199807), vol. 7, no. 3, ISSN 1022-4653, pages 211 - 216, XP000900759 [X] 1,3 * page 215, lines 14-19 of paragraph IV; figure 4 * [A] 4-6 | [PX] - GLENN J ET AL, "A NOVEL VERTICAL DEEP TRENCH RESURF DMOS (VTR-DMOS)", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 12TH INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON POWER SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICES AND ICS, TOULOUSE, FR, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20000522), pages 197 - 200, XP000974099 [PX] 1-6 * paragraph II; figure 1 * | Examination | JPH09213939 | - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971225), vol. 1997, no. 12, & JP09213939 A 19970815 (NEC CORP) |