EP1268574 - EXTRUSION COMPOSITIONS WITH IMPROVED MELT FLOW [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.10.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Equistar Chemicals L.P. 1221 McKinney Street, P.O. Box 2583 Houston Texas 77252-2583 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/01] | For all designated states Equistar Chemicals L.P. 1221 McKinney Street, P.O. Box 2583 Houston, Texas 77252-2583 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Chun, D. 10541 Storybook Drive Cincinnati, OH 45242 / US | 02 /
SHROFF, Ramesh, N. 7952 Chestershire Drive Cincinnati, OH 45241 / US | 03 /
JONES, Jeffrey, A. 8788 White Drive Morrow, OH 45152 / US | [2003/01] | Representative(s) | De Hoop, Eric Octrooibureau Vriesendorp & Gaade B.V. Koninginnegracht 19 2514 AB Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2003/01] | De Hoop, Eric Octrooibureau Vriesendorp & Gaade P.O. Box 266 2501 AW Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 01906870.9 | 01.02.2001 | [2003/01] | WO2001US03295 | Priority number, date | US20000505123 | 16.02.2000 Original published format: US 505123 | [2003/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0160871 | Date: | 23.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1268574 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1268574 | Date: | 15.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.08.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C08L23/12, C08L23/16, C08F8/50 | [2004/25] | CPC: |
H01B3/441 (EP,US);
C08F8/50 (EP,US);
C08L23/04 (EP,US);
C08L23/12 (EP,US);
C08L23/16 (EP,US);
C08F2810/10 (EP,US);
C08L2203/202 (EP,US);
C08L23/06 (EP,US);
C08L23/0815 (EP,US);
C08L2308/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08F8/50, C08F110/06 (US,EP);
C08F8/50, C08F210/06 (EP,US);
C08L23/04, C08L2666/04 (EP,US);
C08L23/12, C08L2666/04 (US,EP); |
Former IPC [2003/01] | C08F8/00, C08F8/50 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EXTRUSIONSZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT VERBESSERTEM SCHMELZFLUSS | [2003/01] | English: | EXTRUSION COMPOSITIONS WITH IMPROVED MELT FLOW | [2003/01] | French: | COMPOSITIONS D'EXTRUSION A INDICE DE FLUIDITE A CHAUD AMELIORE | [2003/01] | Entry into regional phase | 16.08.2002 | National basic fee paid | 16.08.2002 | Search fee paid | 16.08.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.08.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.08.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 16.08.2002 | Examination requested [2003/01] | 24.06.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 12.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.12.2004 | BE | 15.12.2004 | CH | 15.12.2004 | FI | 15.12.2004 | FR | 15.12.2004 | IT | 15.12.2004 | LI | 15.12.2004 | NL | 15.12.2004 | TR | 15.12.2004 | CY | 01.02.2005 | IE | 01.02.2005 | LU | 01.02.2005 | MC | 28.02.2005 | DK | 15.03.2005 | GB | 15.03.2005 | GR | 15.03.2005 | SE | 15.03.2005 | DE | 16.03.2005 | ES | 26.03.2005 | PT | 15.05.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/36] | AT | 15.12.2004 | |
BE | 15.12.2004 | ||
CH | 15.12.2004 | ||
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
FR | 15.12.2004 | ||
IT | 15.12.2004 | ||
LI | 15.12.2004 | ||
NL | 15.12.2004 | ||
TR | 15.12.2004 | ||
CY | 01.02.2005 | ||
IE | 01.02.2005 | ||
LU | 01.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
DK | 15.03.2005 | ||
GB | 15.03.2005 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
SE | 15.03.2005 | ||
DE | 16.03.2005 | ||
ES | 26.03.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | AT | 15.12.2004 | |
BE | 15.12.2004 | ||
CH | 15.12.2004 | ||
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
FR | 15.12.2004 | ||
LI | 15.12.2004 | ||
NL | 15.12.2004 | ||
TR | 15.12.2004 | ||
CY | 01.02.2005 | ||
IE | 01.02.2005 | ||
LU | 01.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
DK | 15.03.2005 | ||
GB | 15.03.2005 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
SE | 15.03.2005 | ||
DE | 16.03.2005 | ||
ES | 26.03.2005 | ||
Former [2007/10] | AT | 15.12.2004 | |
BE | 15.12.2004 | ||
CH | 15.12.2004 | ||
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
FR | 15.12.2004 | ||
LI | 15.12.2004 | ||
NL | 15.12.2004 | ||
TR | 15.12.2004 | ||
IE | 01.02.2005 | ||
LU | 01.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
DK | 15.03.2005 | ||
GB | 15.03.2005 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
SE | 15.03.2005 | ||
DE | 16.03.2005 | ||
ES | 26.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 15.12.2004 | |
BE | 15.12.2004 | ||
CH | 15.12.2004 | ||
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
FR | 15.12.2004 | ||
LI | 15.12.2004 | ||
NL | 15.12.2004 | ||
TR | 15.12.2004 | ||
IE | 01.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
DK | 15.03.2005 | ||
GB | 15.03.2005 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
DE | 16.03.2005 | ||
ES | 26.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/32] | AT | 15.12.2004 | |
BE | 15.12.2004 | ||
CH | 15.12.2004 | ||
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
FR | 15.12.2004 | ||
LI | 15.12.2004 | ||
NL | 15.12.2004 | ||
IE | 01.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
DK | 15.03.2005 | ||
GB | 15.03.2005 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
DE | 16.03.2005 | ||
ES | 26.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/23] | AT | 15.12.2004 | |
BE | 15.12.2004 | ||
CH | 15.12.2004 | ||
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
LI | 15.12.2004 | ||
NL | 15.12.2004 | ||
IE | 01.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
DK | 15.03.2005 | ||
GB | 15.03.2005 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
DE | 16.03.2005 | ||
ES | 26.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 15.12.2004 | |
BE | 15.12.2004 | ||
CH | 15.12.2004 | ||
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
LI | 15.12.2004 | ||
NL | 15.12.2004 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
DK | 15.03.2005 | ||
GB | 15.03.2005 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
DE | 16.03.2005 | ||
ES | 26.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 15.12.2004 | |
BE | 15.12.2004 | ||
CH | 15.12.2004 | ||
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
LI | 15.12.2004 | ||
NL | 15.12.2004 | ||
DK | 15.03.2005 | ||
GB | 15.03.2005 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
DE | 16.03.2005 | ||
ES | 26.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | AT | 15.12.2004 | |
BE | 15.12.2004 | ||
CH | 15.12.2004 | ||
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
LI | 15.12.2004 | ||
DK | 15.03.2005 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
ES | 26.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 15.12.2004 | |
BE | 15.12.2004 | ||
CH | 15.12.2004 | ||
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
LI | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/36] | AT | 15.12.2004 | |
CH | 15.12.2004 | ||
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
LI | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | CH | 15.12.2004 | |
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
LI | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/25] | CH | 15.12.2004 | |
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
LI | 15.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 15.12.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]US4375531 (ROSS JAMES F); | [A]USRE31518E ; | [A]US5639818 (LEE CHUN D [US], et al); | [AP]US6087443 (SADATOSHI HAJIME [JP], et al) |