EP1259785 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR DETECTING RADIATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.05.2008 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.06.2008 [2008/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Litton Systems, Inc. 21240 Burbank Boulevard Woodland Hills California 91367-6675 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/48] | For all designated states LITTON SYSTEMS, INC. 21240 Burbank Boulevard Woodland Hills, California 91367-6675 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OSTROMEK, Timothy, Litton Elec.-Optical Syst. Div. 3414 Herrmann Dr. Garland, TX 75041-6188 / US | [2002/48] | Representative(s) | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Straße 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/48] | Müller - Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte, Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01907024.2 | 06.02.2001 | [2002/48] | WO2001US03806 | Priority number, date | US20000517238 | 02.03.2000 Original published format: US 517238 | [2002/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0165220 | Date: | 07.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1259785 | Date: | 27.11.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.09.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.09.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01J3/50, G01J3/51, G01J9/00 | [2005/04] | CPC: |
G01J9/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/48] | G01J3/50 | Designated contracting states | GB [2004/21] |
Former [2002/48] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR STRAHLUNGSDETEKTION | [2002/48] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR DETECTING RADIATION | [2002/48] | French: | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME PERMETTANT DE DETECTER UN RAYONNEMENT | [2002/48] | Entry into regional phase | 17.07.2002 | National basic fee paid | 17.07.2002 | Search fee paid | 17.07.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.07.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.09.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 17.07.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/48] | 17.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.01.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/26] | 07.02.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2008 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9508206 (ACCUWAVE CORP [US]) [X] 1-13 * abstract * * page 18, line 12 - page 19, line 1 * * page 19, line 15 - page 20, line 5 * * page 31, lines 16-30 *; | [X]EP0930680 (NEC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-13 * paragraphs [0013] - [0023]; figures 1,2 *; | [X]DE19904312 (ANDO ELECTRIC [JP]) [X] 1-13* figures 1,3 * | International search | [X]US3992110 (FRAZER RICHARD A, et al); | [X]US5206502 (GARDNER KEITH L [US]); | [X]US5999271 (SHIH ISHIANG [CA], et al); | [XP]US6094271 (MAEDA MINORU [JP]) |