EP1281039 - CARTRIDGE SHELL AND CARTRIDGE FOR BLAST HOLES AND METHOD OF USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.12.2011 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.01.2012 [2012/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rocktek Ltd. Lot 333 Harries Way Pinjarra, W.A. 6208 / AU | [2003/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOTA, Edward 21 Magnetic Square Mandurah, Western Australia 6210 / AU | 02 /
Nigel Rogers 13 Berrigan Row Halls Head, W.A.6210 / AU | [2003/12] |
Former [2003/06] | 01 /
TOTA, Edward 21 Magnetic Square Mandurah, Western Australia 6210 / AU | ||
02 /
Nigel Rogers 13 Berrigan Row Halls Head, Western AU 6210 / AU | Representative(s) | Schwarz & Partner Patentanwälte GmbH Patentanwälte Wipplingerstraße 30 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2010/23] | Schwarz & Partner Patentanwälte Wipplingerstraße 30 1010 Wien / AT | ||
Former [2003/06] | Kopecky, Helmut, Dipl.-Ing. Kopecky & Schwarz Patentanwälte Wipplingerstrasse 32/22 1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 01907239.6 | 22.02.2001 | [2003/06] | WO2001AU00178 | Priority number, date | AU2000PQ05910 | 29.02.2000 Original published format: AU PQ591000 | [2003/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0165199 | Date: | 07.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1281039 | Date: | 05.02.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.09.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 07.09.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F42B3/04, F42B3/22, F42D1/08, F42D1/12, F42D3/04, E21C37/14 | [2003/06] | CPC data not yet available | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/06] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PATRONENHÜLSE UND PATRONE FÜR SPRENGLÖCHER UND VERWENDUNGSMETHODE | [2003/06] | English: | CARTRIDGE SHELL AND CARTRIDGE FOR BLAST HOLES AND METHOD OF USE | [2003/06] | French: | DOUILLE DE CARTOUCHE ET CARTOUCHE POUR TROUS DE MINE ET PROCEDE D'UTILISATION | [2003/06] | Entry into regional phase | 20.09.2002 | National basic fee paid | 20.09.2002 | Search fee paid | 20.09.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.09.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.09.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 20.09.2002 | Examination requested [2003/06] | 01.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/02] | 16.08.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/02] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.02.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2004 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   14.06.2004 | 28.02.2005 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   30.03.2005 | 28.02.2011 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE134223 (A LEVEN) [X] 1-6,10-13,27-30 * the whole document *; | [XY]US2037906 (RAYMOND HOLRAN JOHN, et al) [X] 1-7,10-13,27-30 * column W * [Y] 31,32; | [X]US2066634 (LUX WILLIAM F) [X] 1-6,10-13,27,29 * column W *; | [Y]US3358601 (DITTMANN DAVID J, et al) [Y] 31,32 * column 3, lines 3-50 * * column 4, lines 59-71 *; | [A]US4754705 (WORSEY PAUL N [US]) [A] 1,12 * column 2, lines 58-68 *; | [PA]WO0060301 (ROCKTEK LTD [AU], et al) [PA] 1,12* page 12, lines 19-27 * | International search | [X]GB618618 (D ENTPR ET DE MECANIQUE SOC IN); | [A]US4754705 (WORSEY PAUL N [US]); | [A]US5247886 (WORSEY PAUL N [US]); | [AP]AU2267300 (ROCKTEK LTD) | Examination | US1832132 |