EP1255472 - ADJUSTABLE CHAIR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.08.2006 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.08.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.09.2006 [2006/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TK Canada Limited 1150 Flint Road Downsview Ontario M3J 2J5 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2002/46] | For all designated states TK Canada Limited 1150 Flint Road Downsview, Ontario M3J 2J5 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEISIG, Wolfgang An der Spandauer Brucke 8 10178 Berlin / DE | [2002/46] | Representative(s) | Harrison, David Christopher, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/46] | Harrison, David Christopher, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 01907273.5 | 16.02.2001 | [2002/46] | WO2001CA00189 | Priority number, date | DE2000107103 | 16.02.2000 Original published format: DE 10007103 | [2002/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0160211 | Date: | 23.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1255472 | Date: | 13.11.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A47C9/02, A47C1/031 | [2002/46] | CPC: |
A47C1/03238 (EP,US);
A47C1/03283 (EP,US);
A47C3/20 (EP,US);
A47C7/024 (EP,US);
A47C9/005 (EP);
A47C9/025 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/46] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERSTELLBARER STUHL | [2002/46] | English: | ADJUSTABLE CHAIR | [2002/46] | French: | CHAISE DE TRAVAIL REGLABLE | [2002/46] | Entry into regional phase | 05.09.2002 | National basic fee paid | 05.09.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.09.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.09.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.09.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/50] | 09.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.03.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/37] | 25.04.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AX]WO9746144 (HAWORTH INC [US], et al) [A] 1-6,8,10 * figure -; claims 1-3 * [X] 9; | [A]US5536067 (PINTO SHLOMO [IL]) [A] 1,6,8,10 * abstract *; | [A]US5435623 (KAPEC JEFFREY [US], et al) [A] 1,6,8,10 * figures 1,3; claim 1 *; | [DA]DE4303021 (BRODMERKEL MARKUS [DE]) [DA] 1,6,8,10 * abstract * | by applicant | DE4303021 | EP0293136 | EP0371729 |