blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1252078

EP1252078 - METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE RUN-UP OF A CONVEYOR BELT AND DRIVE DEVICE FOR A CONVEYOR BELT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.08.2005
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip12.08.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 28.09.2005  [2005/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/44]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / BECKER, Norbert
Wiesenstrasse 15
91341 Röttenbach / DE
02 / NEUFFER, Ingemar
Rudelsweiherstrasse 49
91054 Erlangen / DE
 [2002/44]
Application number, filing date01907333.705.01.2001
[2002/44]
WO2001DE00026
Priority number, dateDE200010256321.01.2000         Original published format: DE 10002563
[2002/44]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO0153174
Date:26.07.2001
Language:DE
[2001/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1252078
Date:30.10.2002
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.07.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2002/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1252078
Date:06.10.2004
Language:DE
[2004/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.07.2001
ClassificationIPC:B65G23/00, B65G43/00, H02P5/00, G05D13/00
[2002/44]
CPC:
G05B19/416 (EP,US); B65G43/00 (EP,US); G05D13/62 (EP,US);
G05B2219/43025 (EP,US); G05B2219/43027 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT [2004/41]
Former [2002/44]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM STEUERN DES HOCHLAUFS EINES FÖRDERBANDES UND ANTRIEBSEINRICHTUNG FÜR EIN FÖRDERBAND[2002/44]
English:METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE RUN-UP OF A CONVEYOR BELT AND DRIVE DEVICE FOR A CONVEYOR BELT[2002/44]
French:PROCEDE DE COMMANDE DE LA MONTEE EN REGIME D'UNE BANDE TRANSPORTEUSE ET DISPOSITIF D'ENTRAINEMENT D'UNE BANDE TRANSPORTEUSE[2002/44]
Entry into regional phase01.07.2002National basic fee paid 
01.07.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
01.07.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.07.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
02.07.2002Examination requested  [2002/44]
06.04.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.08.2004Fee for grant paid
04.08.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.07.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
19.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[XA]US4706003  (NAKASHIMA SEIICHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,7,8 * column 2, line 36 - column 4, line 12 * * column 4, line 65 - column 5, line 4; figures 5,6 * [A] 3-6,9,10;
 [A]EP0433627  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-10* the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.