EP1257719 - Silo and method for building a silo [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/47] | SILO AND SHELL ELEMENT FOR SAID SILO | ||
[2010/09] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.2011 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Andersen, Erik Borup Voldbyvej 77 8464 Galten / DK | [2002/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2002/47] | Representative(s) | Nielsen, Leif Patrade A/S Ceresbyen 75 8000 Aarhus C / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2002/47] | Nielsen, Leif Patrade A/S Fredens Torv 3A 8000 Aarhus C / DK | Application number, filing date | 01907387.3 | 22.02.2001 | [2002/47] | WO2001DK00121 | Priority number, date | DK20000000282 | 23.02.2000 Original published format: DK 200000282 | [2002/47] | Filing language | DA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0163074 | Date: | 30.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1257719 | Date: | 20.11.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1257719 | Date: | 18.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 30.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | E04H7/22 | [2002/47] | CPC: |
E04H7/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/47] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Silo und Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Silos | [2010/09] | English: | Silo and method for building a silo | [2010/09] | French: | Silo et méthode pour assembler un silo | [2010/09] |
Former [2002/47] | SILO UND VERKLEIDUNGSELEMENT DAFÜR | ||
Former [2002/47] | SILO AND SHELL ELEMENT FOR SAID SILO | ||
Former [2002/47] | SILO ET ELEMENT DE REVETEMENT DUDIT SILO | Entry into regional phase | 05.09.2002 | National basic fee paid | 05.09.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.09.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.08.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/47] | 29.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 09.07.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.05.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 06.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 06.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.08.2010 | BE | 18.08.2010 | CY | 18.08.2010 | DK | 18.08.2010 | FI | 18.08.2010 | IT | 18.08.2010 | NL | 18.08.2010 | SE | 18.08.2010 | TR | 18.08.2010 | GR | 19.11.2010 | ES | 29.11.2010 | PT | 20.12.2010 | GB | 22.02.2011 | IE | 22.02.2011 | LU | 22.02.2011 | CH | 28.02.2011 | FR | 28.02.2011 | LI | 28.02.2011 | MC | 28.02.2011 | [2013/44] |
Former [2013/25] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
BE | 18.08.2010 | ||
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
IT | 18.08.2010 | ||
NL | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
ES | 29.11.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
GB | 22.02.2011 | ||
IE | 22.02.2011 | ||
LU | 22.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
FR | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
BE | 18.08.2010 | ||
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
IT | 18.08.2010 | ||
NL | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
ES | 29.11.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
GB | 22.02.2011 | ||
IE | 22.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
FR | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
BE | 18.08.2010 | ||
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
IT | 18.08.2010 | ||
NL | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
ES | 29.11.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
IE | 22.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
FR | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2012/06] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
BE | 18.08.2010 | ||
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
IT | 18.08.2010 | ||
NL | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
ES | 29.11.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
FR | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
BE | 18.08.2010 | ||
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
IT | 18.08.2010 | ||
NL | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
ES | 29.11.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/45] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
BE | 18.08.2010 | ||
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
IT | 18.08.2010 | ||
NL | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
ES | 29.11.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/31] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
BE | 18.08.2010 | ||
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
IT | 18.08.2010 | ||
NL | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
ES | 29.11.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
BE | 18.08.2010 | ||
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
NL | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/17] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
BE | 18.08.2010 | ||
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
NL | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 18.08.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]DK37504C (JACOBSEN CHRISTIAN); | [A]DE2853325 (WILSTRUP AS PIERRE MIDTJYSK); | [A]EP0637553 (IND TANKBUILDERS BV [NL]); | [A]EP0758618 (IND TANKBUILDERS BV [NL]); | [A]EP0831191 (PEREZ MANGLANO SOTO JULIO [ES], et al); | [A]WO0049249 (JANSSENS & DIEPERINK B V [NL], et al) | Examination | DE2618910 |