EP1251818 - GALENIC FORMULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.05.2009 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Patent GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [2008/27] |
Former [2002/44] | For all designated states MERCK PATENT GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BÜNGER, Joachim Wilhelm-Leuschner-Strasse 181 64823 Gross-Umstadt / DE | 02 /
ZUR LAGE, Jutta Kaupstrasse 11 64289 Darmstadt / DE | 03 /
AXT, Alexandra Thüringer Strasse 24 64380 Rossdorf / DE | [2002/44] | Application number, filing date | 01907448.3 | 15.01.2001 | [2002/44] | WO2001EP00396 | Priority number, date | DE2000103786 | 28.01.2000 Original published format: DE 10003786 | [2002/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0154653 | Date: | 02.08.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1251818 | Date: | 30.10.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1251818 | Date: | 02.07.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/27] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP1251818 | Date: | 07.01.2009 | [2009/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/49, A61Q19/00 | [2008/09] | CPC: |
A61K9/107 (EP,US);
A61K31/355 (EP,US);
A61K31/455 (EP,US);
A61K31/52 (EP,US);
A61K8/40 (EP,US);
A61K8/4926 (EP,US);
A61K8/4953 (EP,US);
A61K8/67 (EP,US);
A61K8/671 (EP,US);
A61K8/675 (EP,US);
A61K8/678 (EP,US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61Q17/00 (EP,US);
A61Q17/04 (EP,US);
A61Q19/00 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/355, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/455, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/52, A61K2300/00 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [2002/44] | A61K7/00, A61K7/48 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/44] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GALENISCHE FORMULIERUNG | [2002/44] | English: | GALENIC FORMULATION | [2002/44] | French: | FORMULATION GALENIQUE | [2002/44] | Entry into regional phase | 04.06.2002 | National basic fee paid | 04.06.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.06.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.07.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/44] | 16.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.05.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 19.05.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.04.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 02.07.2008 | DK | 02.07.2008 | FI | 02.07.2008 | IE | 02.07.2008 | NL | 02.07.2008 | TR | 02.07.2008 | SE | 02.10.2008 | GR | 03.10.2008 | PT | 02.12.2008 | AT | 15.01.2009 | LU | 15.01.2009 | BE | 31.01.2009 | CH | 31.01.2009 | LI | 31.01.2009 | MC | 31.01.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/21] | DK | 02.07.2008 | |
FI | 02.07.2008 | ||
IE | 02.07.2008 | ||
NL | 02.07.2008 | ||
SE | 02.10.2008 | ||
GR | 03.10.2008 | ||
PT | 02.12.2008 | ||
AT | 15.01.2009 | ||
LU | 15.01.2009 | ||
BE | 31.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/47] | DK | 02.07.2008 | |
FI | 02.07.2008 | ||
IE | 02.07.2008 | ||
NL | 02.07.2008 | ||
SE | 02.10.2008 | ||
GR | 03.10.2008 | ||
PT | 02.12.2008 | ||
AT | 15.01.2009 | ||
BE | 31.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/30] | DK | 02.07.2008 | |
FI | 02.07.2008 | ||
IE | 02.07.2008 | ||
NL | 02.07.2008 | ||
SE | 02.10.2008 | ||
PT | 02.12.2008 | ||
AT | 15.01.2009 | ||
BE | 31.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | DK | 02.07.2008 | |
FI | 02.07.2008 | ||
IE | 02.07.2008 | ||
NL | 02.07.2008 | ||
SE | 02.10.2008 | ||
PT | 02.12.2008 | ||
BE | 31.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | DK | 02.07.2008 | |
FI | 02.07.2008 | ||
IE | 02.07.2008 | ||
NL | 02.07.2008 | ||
SE | 02.10.2008 | ||
PT | 02.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | DK | 02.07.2008 | |
FI | 02.07.2008 | ||
IE | 02.07.2008 | ||
NL | 02.07.2008 | ||
PT | 02.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/37] | DK | 02.07.2008 | |
FI | 02.07.2008 | ||
IE | 02.07.2008 | ||
NL | 02.07.2008 | ||
PT | 02.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/23] | DK | 02.07.2008 | |
FI | 02.07.2008 | ||
IE | 02.07.2008 | ||
NL | 02.07.2008 | ||
PT | 02.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/20] | DK | 02.07.2008 | |
FI | 02.07.2008 | ||
NL | 02.07.2008 | ||
PT | 02.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | FI | 02.07.2008 | |
NL | 02.07.2008 | ||
PT | 02.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/01] | NL | 02.07.2008 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5665367 (BURGER ALLAN ROBERT [US], et al) [X] 1,4,12-17 * claim 1 *; | [X]US5972993 (PTCHELINTSEV DMITRI [US]) [X] 1,4-6,12-17 * claims 1,6,17 *; | [PX]DE19834818 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [PX] 1,12-17* page 6, lines 30,31; claims 1,4,7,19 * | Examination | JPS53200039 | GB1308483 | EP0521647 | JPH06256175 | EP1433477 | - PHOENIX J.; EDWARDS R.H.T.; JACKSON M.J., "The effect of vitamin E analogues and long hydrocarbon chain compounds on calcium-induced muscle damage. A novel role for alpha-tocopherol ?", BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA, (1991), no. 1097, doi:doi:10.1016/0925-4439(91)90037-A, pages 212 - 218, XP023554730 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0925-4439(91)90037-A | - INTERNATONAL COSMETIC INGREDIENT DICTIONARY AND HANDBOOK, (2004), vol. 3, page 1903-1904, 2184-2185 |