EP1265699 - METHOD FOR CARRYING OUT A METATHESIS REACTION OF UNSATURATED ORGANIC COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.05.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Patent GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/51] | For all designated states MERCK PATENT GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WURZIGER, Hanns Greinstrasse 7b 64291 Darmstadt / DE | 02 /
PIEPER, Guido Malvenweg 18 64291 Darmstadt / DE | 03 /
SCHWESINGER, Norbert Sturmheide 10 98693 Ilmenau / DE | [2003/03] |
Former [2002/51] | 01 /
WURZIGER, Hanns Greinstrasse 7b 64291 Darmstadt / DE | ||
02 /
PIEPER, Guido Adlerstrasse 57 68199 Mannheim / DE | |||
03 /
SCHWESINGER, Norbert Sturmheide 10 98693 Ilmenau / DE | Application number, filing date | 01907573.8 | 01.03.2001 | [2002/51] | WO2001EP02301 | Priority number, date | DE2000114297 | 23.03.2000 Original published format: DE 10014297 | [2002/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0170387 | Date: | 27.09.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1265699 | Date: | 18.12.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.09.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1265699 | Date: | 29.06.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B01J19/00, C07C6/02 | [2002/51] | CPC: |
C07B37/00 (EP,US);
B01J19/0093 (EP,US);
C07C6/06 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00835 (EP,US);
B01J2219/0086 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00862 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C6/06, C07C13/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | 27.09.2002 | LV | 27.09.2002 | MK | Not yet paid | RO | 27.09.2002 | SI | 27.09.2002 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR METATHESEREAKTION UNGESÄTTIGTER ORGANISCHER VERBINDUNGEN | [2002/51] | English: | METHOD FOR CARRYING OUT A METATHESIS REACTION OF UNSATURATED ORGANIC COMPOUNDS | [2002/51] | French: | PROCEDE POUR REALISER LA METATHESE DE COMPOSES ORGANIQUES INSATURES | [2002/51] | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.2002 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.09.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/51] | 20.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.12.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 29.06.2005 | FI | 29.06.2005 | IE | 29.06.2005 | IT | 29.06.2005 | TR | 29.06.2005 | DK | 29.09.2005 | GR | 29.09.2005 | SE | 29.09.2005 | ES | 10.10.2005 | PT | 07.12.2005 | AT | 01.03.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/37] | FI | 29.06.2005 | |
IE | 29.06.2005 | ||
IT | 29.06.2005 | ||
TR | 29.06.2005 | ||
DK | 29.09.2005 | ||
GR | 29.09.2005 | ||
SE | 29.09.2005 | ||
ES | 10.10.2005 | ||
PT | 07.12.2005 | ||
AT | 01.03.2006 | ||
Former [2007/46] | FI | 29.06.2005 | |
IE | 29.06.2005 | ||
IT | 29.06.2005 | ||
DK | 29.09.2005 | ||
GR | 29.09.2005 | ||
SE | 29.09.2005 | ||
ES | 10.10.2005 | ||
PT | 07.12.2005 | ||
AT | 01.03.2006 | ||
Former [2007/36] | FI | 29.06.2005 | |
IE | 29.06.2005 | ||
IT | 29.06.2005 | ||
DK | 29.09.2005 | ||
GR | 29.09.2005 | ||
SE | 29.09.2005 | ||
ES | 10.10.2005 | ||
PT | 07.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/26] | FI | 29.06.2005 | |
IE | 29.06.2005 | ||
DK | 29.09.2005 | ||
GR | 29.09.2005 | ||
SE | 29.09.2005 | ||
ES | 10.10.2005 | ||
PT | 07.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | FI | 29.06.2005 | |
IE | 29.06.2005 | ||
GR | 29.09.2005 | ||
SE | 29.09.2005 | ||
ES | 10.10.2005 | ||
PT | 07.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 29.06.2005 | |
GR | 29.09.2005 | ||
SE | 29.09.2005 | ||
ES | 10.10.2005 | ||
PT | 07.12.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 29.06.2005 | |
SE | 29.09.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | SE | 29.09.2005 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0456373 (NESTE OY [FI]) [X] 1,2* page 4, line 14 - page 4, line 25 *; | [Y]DE4433439 (KERNFORSCHUNGSZ KARLSRUHE [DE], et al) [Y] 1-16 * claim - *; | [Y]WO9951344 (AVENTIS RES & TECH GMBH & CO [DE], et al) [Y] 1-16 * page 16, line 11 - page 23 *; | [PX]WO0051720 (SYMYX TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [PX] 1,2 * page 28, line 34 * * abstract * |