EP1268964 - ELECTROMAGNETIC LOCK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.10.2007 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Digit Societe a Responsibilite Limitee 31, avenue du Général Leclerc 93500 Pantin / FR | [2003/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRAMI, Daniel, Salomon 3, avenue des Mimosas F-92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | 02 /
EL MECHALI, Isaac 4, rue de Moscou F-93500 Pantin / FR | 03 /
DEFERT, Jean, Michel 5, allée des Tilleuls F-95110 Sannois / FR | [2003/01] | Representative(s) | Vander-Heym, Serge Henri Marcel Cabinet Vander-Heym 22, avenue de Friedland 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/01] | Vander-Heym, Serge CABINET R. VANDER-HEYM 172, Boulevard Voltaire 75011 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 01907769.2 | 13.02.2001 | [2003/01] | WO2001FR00404 | Priority number, date | FR20000004004 | 30.03.2000 Original published format: FR 0004004 | [2003/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0175257 | Date: | 11.10.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1268964 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.10.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1268964 | Date: | 29.11.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | E05C19/16 | [2003/01] | CPC: |
E05C19/168 (EP,US);
Y10S292/55 (EP,US);
Y10T292/1082 (EP,US);
Y10T292/11 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTROMAGNETISCHES SCHLOSS | [2003/01] | English: | ELECTROMAGNETIC LOCK | [2003/01] | French: | SERRURE ELECTROMAGNETIQUE | [2003/01] | Entry into regional phase | 08.10.2002 | National basic fee paid | 08.10.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.10.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.06.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.10.2002 | Examination requested [2003/01] | 06.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.11.2006 | CY | 29.11.2006 | FI | 29.11.2006 | IE | 29.11.2006 | TR | 29.11.2006 | LU | 13.02.2007 | DK | 28.02.2007 | MC | 28.02.2007 | GR | 01.03.2007 | PT | 30.04.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/37] | AT | 29.11.2006 | |
CY | 29.11.2006 | ||
FI | 29.11.2006 | ||
IE | 29.11.2006 | ||
LU | 13.02.2007 | ||
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
GR | 01.03.2007 | ||
PT | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 29.11.2006 | |
FI | 29.11.2006 | ||
IE | 29.11.2006 | ||
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
GR | 01.03.2007 | ||
PT | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | AT | 29.11.2006 | |
FI | 29.11.2006 | ||
IE | 29.11.2006 | ||
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
PT | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/42] | AT | 29.11.2006 | |
FI | 29.11.2006 | ||
IE | 29.11.2006 | ||
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
PT | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/37] | AT | 29.11.2006 | |
FI | 29.11.2006 | ||
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
PT | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/36] | AT | 29.11.2006 | |
FI | 29.11.2006 | ||
PT | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 29.11.2006 | |
FI | 29.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/25] | FI | 29.11.2006 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4840411 (SOWERSBY ALAN C [US]) [X] 1,3* column 3, line 67 - column 4, line 37; figures 1-5 *; | [XY]GB2263137 (HARROW PRODUCTS INC [US]) [X] 1,3 * page 10, line 5 - page 11, line 10; figures 1-6 * * page 12, line 11 - page 14, line 8; figures 7-10 * [Y] 2; | [DYA]WO9918315 (SECURITRON MAGNALOCK CORP [US]) [DY] 2 * page 12, line 4 - line 18; figures 5A-6F * [A] 1 |