Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2001320638 | Global Dossier | 16.11.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2000058730 | 03.03.2000 | JP2001058273 | 02.03.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU3601501 | Global Dossier | 12.09.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | JP0101553 | 01.03.2001 | JP2000058730 | 03.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1175789 | Global Dossier | 30.01.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP0101553 | 01.03.2001 | JP2000058730 | 03.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1039710 | 03.05.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP0101553 | 01.03.2001 | JP2000058730 | 03.03.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0165860 | Global Dossier | 07.02.2002 | A3 | WO0165860 | 07.09.2001 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP2000058730 | 03.03.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW501371B | 01.09.2002 | B | Priority number | Date | JP2000058730 | 03.03.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2001052128 | 13.12.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2000058730 | 03.03.2000 |