EP1175789 - SIGNAL CONVERTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.03.2003 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.05.2003 [2003/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Computer Entertainment Inc. 1-1, Akasaka 7-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-0052 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/05] | For all designated states Sony Computer Entertainment Inc. 1-1, Akasaka 7-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-0052 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHINJO, Sadaaki Sony Computer Entertainment Inc. 1-1, Akasaka 7-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-0052 / JP | [2002/05] | Representative(s) | Grättinger Möhring von Poschinger Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 16 55 82306 Starnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/05] | Grättinger & Partner (GbR) Wittelsbacherstrasse 5 82319 Starnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 01908184.3 | 01.03.2001 | [2002/05] | WO2001JP01553 | Priority number, date | JP20000058730 | 03.03.2000 Original published format: JP 2000058730 | [2002/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0165860 | Date: | 07.09.2001 | [2001/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1175789 | Date: | 30.01.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.09.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04N11/20 | [2002/05] | CPC: |
H04N5/44 (EP,US);
H04N21/4112 (EP,US);
H04N5/7755 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/05] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SIGNALWANDLER | [2002/05] | English: | SIGNAL CONVERTER | [2002/05] | French: | CONVERTISSEUR DE SIGNAUX | [2002/05] | Entry into regional phase | 07.11.2001 | National basic fee paid | 07.11.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | Examination procedure | 15.10.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/19] | 03.12.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [2003/19] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAY]JPS63142782 ; | [YA]GB2206758 (NINTENDO CO LTD) [Y] 7 * figures 1,2,4,5 * [A] 1-5,11; | [A]WO9940721 (ZENITH ELECTRONICS CORP [US]) [A] 1,8,9,15 * abstract * * page 6, line 16 - line 28 *; | [A]US5680297 (PRICE NOAH M [US], et al) [A] 6,9 * abstract * * column 2, line 21 - line 30 *; | [A]US5831324 (BANG IL-SOON [KR]) [A] 6,9 * column 1, line 50 - column 2, line 4 *; | [A]EP0938919 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 3,7,11 * abstract * | [XAY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19881025), vol. 012, no. 402, Database accession no. (E - 673), & JP63142782 A 19880615 (SONY CORP) [X] 1-5 * abstract * [A] 9-14 [Y] 7,8 | [YA] - STRONG, "Compatibility Considerations for DBS Home Terminals", COMMUNICATIONS: COMMUNICATIONS IN THE INFORMATION AGE. ATLANTA, NOVEMBER 26 - 29, 1984, PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE (GLOBECOM), IEEE, US, (19841126), vol. 1, ISBN 0-87942-632-2, pages 447 - 451, XP002180218 [Y] 8 * page 448, column L, paragraph L; figures 1,2 * [A] 15 |