EP1370333 - INFORMATION PROCESSING SYSTEM, ENTERTAINMENT SYSTEM, STARTUP SCREEN DISPLAY METHOD AND INFORMATION RECORDING MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.04.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.05.2008 [2008/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Computer Entertainment Inc. 1-1, Akasaka 7-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-0052 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/51] | For all designated states Sony Computer Entertainment Inc. 1-1, Akasaka 7-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-0052 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUTARAGI, Ken, Sony Computer Entertainment Inc. 1-1, Akasaka 7-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-0052 / JP | 02 /
TSURUOKA, Taizo, Sony Computer Entertainment Inc. 1-1, Akasaka 7-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-0052 / JP | [2003/51] | Representative(s) | Hedley, Nicholas James Matthew, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lancon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/51] | Hedley, Nicholas James Matthew, et al Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 01908185.0 | 01.03.2001 | [2003/51] | WO2001JP01554 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02070092 | Date: | 12.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1370333 | Date: | 17.12.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A63F13/10, G06F9/445 | [2003/51] | CPC: |
G06F9/4401 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/51] | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSSYSTEM, UNTERHALTUNGSYSTEM, STARTSCHIRMDARSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN UND INFORMATIONSAUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM | [2003/51] | English: | INFORMATION PROCESSING SYSTEM, ENTERTAINMENT SYSTEM, STARTUP SCREEN DISPLAY METHOD AND INFORMATION RECORDING MEDIUM | [2003/51] | French: | SYSTEME DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS, SYSTEME DE DIVERTISSEMENT, PROCEDE D'AFFICHAGE D'UN ECRAN DE COMMENCEMENT ET SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT D'INFORMATIONS | [2003/51] | Entry into regional phase | 24.05.2002 | National basic fee paid | 24.05.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.05.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.05.2002 | Examination requested [2003/51] | 14.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.10.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/22] | 28.12.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5498003 (GECHTER JERRY [US]) [A] 1-73 * column 11, line 8 - line 20 * * column 13, line 8 - line 61 ** figure 9 *; | [Y]WO9962606 (SONY COMPUTER ENTERTAINMENT INC [JP]) [Y] 2,26,42,43,59,60 * page 7, line 21 - line 24 * * page 8, line 8 - line 11 * * page 17, line 21 - page 18, line 24 * * figure 4 *; | [XY]WO0006271 (SONY COMPUTER ENTERTAINMENT INC [JP]) [X] 1,25 * page 1, line 25 - page 2, line 1 * * page 3, line 11 - line 13 * * page 4, line 15 - line 21 * * page 8, line 18 - page 9, line 26 * * page 11, line 10 - line 13 * * page 12, line 16 - line 23 * * page 14, line 4 - line 9 * * figure 1 * [Y] 2,26,42,43,59,60 |