EP1277666 - INNER BAG FOR BAG-IN-BOX [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2008 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 03.10.2012 [2012/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIMORI KOGYO CO., LTD. 4-16, Nihonbashi Bakuro-cho 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0002 / JP | [2007/33] |
Former [2003/04] | For all designated states FUJIMORI KOGYO CO., LTD. 4-16, Nihonbashi Bakuro-cho 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0002 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YONEYAMA, Michinori, Fujimori Kogyo Co., Ltd 4-16, Nihonbashi-bakurocho 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0002 / JP | 02 /
ICHIKAWA, Makoto, Fujimori Kogyo Co., Ltd 4-16, Nibonbashi-bakurocho 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0002 / JP | [2003/04] | Representative(s) | Banzer, Hans-Jörg Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/04] | Banzer, Hans-Jörg, Dipl.-Ing. Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01908208.0 | 01.03.2001 | [2003/04] | WO2001JP01579 | Priority number, date | JP20000056403 | 01.03.2000 Original published format: JP 2000056403 | JP20000063866 | 08.03.2000 Original published format: JP 2000063866 | [2003/04] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0164536 | Date: | 07.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1277666 | Date: | 22.01.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.09.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1277666 | Date: | 15.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.09.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B65D33/10, B65D77/06, B65D33/02, B65D33/06 | [2005/41] | CPC: |
B65D31/02 (EP,US);
B65D31/10 (EP,US);
B65D33/02 (EP,US);
B65D33/06 (EP,US);
B65D77/062 (EP,US);
B65D77/065 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/04] | B65D33/10, B65D77/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/04] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INNENBEUTEL FÜR BAG-IN-BOX | [2003/04] | English: | INNER BAG FOR BAG-IN-BOX | [2003/04] | French: | SACHET INTERIEUR D'UNE CAISSE-OUTRE | [2003/04] | Entry into regional phase | 05.09.2002 | Translation filed | 05.09.2002 | National basic fee paid | 05.09.2002 | Search fee paid | 05.09.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.09.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.09.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 05.09.2002 | Examination requested [2003/04] | 01.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 28.06.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.08.2007 | BE | 15.08.2007 | CH | 15.08.2007 | CY | 15.08.2007 | DK | 15.08.2007 | FI | 15.08.2007 | LI | 15.08.2007 | NL | 15.08.2007 | TR | 15.08.2007 | SE | 15.11.2007 | DE | 16.11.2007 | GR | 16.11.2007 | ES | 26.11.2007 | PT | 15.01.2008 | GB | 01.03.2008 | LU | 01.03.2008 | IE | 03.03.2008 | IT | 31.03.2008 | MC | 31.03.2008 | FR | 11.04.2008 | [2012/40] |
Former [2011/13] | AT | 15.08.2007 | |
BE | 15.08.2007 | ||
CH | 15.08.2007 | ||
CY | 15.08.2007 | ||
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
LI | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
TR | 15.08.2007 | ||
SE | 15.11.2007 | ||
DE | 16.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
ES | 26.11.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
GB | 01.03.2008 | ||
LU | 01.03.2008 | ||
IE | 03.03.2008 | ||
IT | 31.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2010/37] | AT | 15.08.2007 | |
BE | 15.08.2007 | ||
CH | 15.08.2007 | ||
CY | 15.08.2007 | ||
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
LI | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
TR | 15.08.2007 | ||
SE | 15.11.2007 | ||
DE | 16.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
ES | 26.11.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
GB | 01.03.2008 | ||
LU | 01.03.2008 | ||
IE | 03.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 15.08.2007 | |
BE | 15.08.2007 | ||
CH | 15.08.2007 | ||
CY | 15.08.2007 | ||
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
LI | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
SE | 15.11.2007 | ||
DE | 16.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
ES | 26.11.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
GB | 01.03.2008 | ||
LU | 01.03.2008 | ||
IE | 03.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/33] | AT | 15.08.2007 | |
BE | 15.08.2007 | ||
CH | 15.08.2007 | ||
CY | 15.08.2007 | ||
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
LI | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
SE | 15.11.2007 | ||
DE | 16.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
ES | 26.11.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
GB | 01.03.2008 | ||
IE | 03.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | AT | 15.08.2007 | |
BE | 15.08.2007 | ||
CH | 15.08.2007 | ||
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
LI | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
SE | 15.11.2007 | ||
DE | 16.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
ES | 26.11.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
GB | 01.03.2008 | ||
IE | 03.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT | 15.08.2007 | |
BE | 15.08.2007 | ||
CH | 15.08.2007 | ||
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
LI | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
SE | 15.11.2007 | ||
DE | 16.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
ES | 26.11.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
IE | 03.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 15.08.2007 | |
BE | 15.08.2007 | ||
CH | 15.08.2007 | ||
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
LI | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
SE | 15.11.2007 | ||
DE | 16.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
ES | 26.11.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/36] | AT | 15.08.2007 | |
BE | 15.08.2007 | ||
CH | 15.08.2007 | ||
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
LI | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
SE | 15.11.2007 | ||
DE | 16.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
ES | 26.11.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 15.08.2007 | |
BE | 15.08.2007 | ||
CH | 15.08.2007 | ||
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
LI | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
SE | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
ES | 26.11.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/26] | AT | 15.08.2007 | |
BE | 15.08.2007 | ||
CH | 15.08.2007 | ||
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
LI | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
ES | 26.11.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/23] | AT | 15.08.2007 | |
BE | 15.08.2007 | ||
CH | 15.08.2007 | ||
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
LI | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
ES | 26.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 15.08.2007 | |
BE | 15.08.2007 | ||
CH | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
LI | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
ES | 26.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/13] | AT | 15.08.2007 | |
CH | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
LI | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
ES | 26.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | FI | 15.08.2007 | |
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
ES | 26.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | NL | 15.08.2007 | |
ES | 26.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | ES | 26.11.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]JP2001031110 ; | [A]GB2126984 (GOOCH) [A] 6-11* figures 3,7 *; | [A]JPH028763U (KIRIN BREWERY) [A] 6-9,11 * figure 8 *; | [X]US5788121 (SASAKI HITOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,3 * sentence 16 - sentence 32; figure 4 * | [PX] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010605), vol. 2000, no. 19, & JP2001031110 A 20010206 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [PX] 6-11 * abstract * | International search | [Y]JPS6287033U ; | [A]JPH028763U ; | [Y]JPH06312750 (DAIWA HOUZAI KK); | [X]JPH10250747 (HOSOKAWA YOKO KK) |