Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1274001
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
03.03.2006 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 19.04.2006 [2006/16] |
05.11.2005 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
04.05.2005 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
09.04.2004 |
Change - designated states |
published on 26.05.2004 [2004/22] |
19.03.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.03.2004 |
Change - applicant |
published on 06.05.2004 [2004/19] |
05.05.2003 |
Change - extension states |
|
04.04.2003 |
Renewal fee |
|
22.11.2002 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 08.01.2003 [2003/02] |
22.11.2002 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 08.01.2003 [2003/02] |
20.11.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.11.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.09.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.08.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.02.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.09.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.09.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.09.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.09.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.03.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|