Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0165351 | Global Dossier | 07.09.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2000056480 | 01.03.2000 | JP0001827 | 24.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0165350 | Global Dossier | 07.09.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2000056480 | 01.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20020077867 | Global Dossier | 14.10.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2000056480 | 01.03.2000 | JP0001827 | 24.03.2000 | JP0101589 | 01.03.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2003091354 | Global Dossier | 28.03.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2000056480 | 01.03.2000 | JP0001827 | 24.03.2000 | JP2002147179 | 22.05.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2003060768 | Global Dossier | 28.02.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2002147181 | 22.05.2002 | JP2000056480 | 01.03.2000 | JP0001827 | 24.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2003058309 | Global Dossier | 28.02.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2000056480 | 01.03.2000 | JP2002147180 | 22.05.2002 | JP0001827 | 24.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU3603701 | Global Dossier | 12.09.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2000056480 | 01.03.2000 | JP0001827 | 24.03.2000 | JP0101589 | 01.03.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU3327700 | Global Dossier | 12.09.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2000056480 | 01.03.2000 | JP0001827 | 24.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1274001 | Global Dossier | 08.01.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2000056480 | 01.03.2000 | JP0001827 | 24.03.2000 | JP0101589 | 01.03.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2401217 | 07.09.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2000056480 | 01.03.2000 | JP0001827 | 24.03.2000 | JP0101589 | 01.03.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2003101178 | 29.05.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2000056480 | 01.03.2000 | JP0001827 | 24.03.2000 |