EP1205570 - COLOR CRT MASK FRAME, STEEL PLATE FOR USE THEREIN, PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE STEEL PLATE, AND COLOR CRT HAVING THE FRAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.05.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2007 | Change or deletion - application deemed withdrawn | published on 06.06.2007 [2007/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/20] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOSHII, Tatsuo 9-29, Horidomenishi 1-chome Wakayama-shi, Wakayama 641-0045 / JP | 02 /
NAGAO, Noriaki 14-10-402, Minamishinzaike Himeji-shi, Hyogo 670-0093 / JP | 03 /
TSUGE, Shinji 31-9, Higashiymadai 3-chome Nishinomiya-shi, Hyogo 669-1133 / JP | 04 /
OHMAE, Hideharu 20-3, Higashitoyonaka 4-chome Toyonaka-shi, Osaka 560-0003 / JP | [2002/20] | Representative(s) | Schrimpf, Robert, et al Cabinet Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris cedex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/20] | Schrimpf, Robert, et al Cabinet Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris cedex 17 / FR | Application number, filing date | 01908231.2 | 02.03.2001 | [2002/20] | WO2001JP01602 | Priority number, date | JP20000057551 | 02.03.2000 Original published format: JP 2000057551 | [2002/20] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0164968 | Date: | 07.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1205570 | Date: | 15.05.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.09.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.09.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C22C38/00, C21D9/46, H01J29/07 | [2002/20] | CPC: |
C22C38/22 (EP,US);
C22C38/42 (KR);
C21D8/0226 (EP,US);
C22C38/04 (EP,US);
C22C38/06 (EP,US);
C22C38/12 (EP,US);
C22C38/24 (EP,US);
H01J29/07 (EP,US);
C21D8/0236 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/20] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FARBKATHODENSTRAHLRÖHRE-MASKENRAHMEN, DARIN VERWENDETE STAHLPLATTE, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR DIESE STAHLPLATTE UND FARBKATHODENSTRAHLRÖHRE MIT DIESEM MASKENRAHMEN | [2002/20] | English: | COLOR CRT MASK FRAME, STEEL PLATE FOR USE THEREIN, PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE STEEL PLATE, AND COLOR CRT HAVING THE FRAME | [2002/20] | French: | CADRE DE MASQUE D'ECRAN CATHODIQUE COULEUR, PLAQUE D'ACIER UTILE DANS CE MASQUE, PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE CETTE PLAQUE, ET ECRAN CATHODIQUE COULEUR DOTE DE CE CADRE | [2002/20] | Entry into regional phase | 05.11.2001 | Translation filed | 19.11.2001 | National basic fee paid | 19.11.2001 | Search fee paid | 19.11.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.01.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/25] | 02.10.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/22] | 03.10.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/23] | 20.12.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2006 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPH09118952 ; | [XA]JPH10226821 ; | [XA]JPH0949050 ; | [XA]EP0630983 (NIPPON KOKAN KK [JP]) [X] 1-3,8-10 * claims 1-6 * [A] 4-7,11-14; | [XA]EP0620289 (JAPAN CASTING FORGING CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,8,9 * claims 1-8 * [A] 4-7,10-14; | [XA]EP0347156 (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP]) [X] 1-10 * claims 1-10 * [A] ; | [XA]US5362338 (IWAMA NAOKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,8 * claims 1-12 * [A] 2,4-7,9-14; | [XA]US4397697 (FREIER KLAUS [DE], et al) [X] 1,3,8 * claims 1-13 * [A] 2,4-7,9-14 | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970930), vol. 1997, no. 09, & JP09118952 A 19970506 (KOBE STEEL LTD) [X] 1-3,8-10 * abstract * [A] 4-7,11-14 | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981130), vol. 1998, no. 13, & JP10226821 A 19980825 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [X] 1-3,8,9 * abstract * [A] 4-7,10-14 | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970630), vol. 1997, no. 06, & JP09049050 A 19970218 (KOBE STEEL LTD) [X] 1-3,8,9 * abstract * [A] 4-7,10-14 | International search | [Y]JPH0867945 (NISSHIN STEEL CO LTD); | [Y]JPH08176728 (JAPAN CASTING FORGING CORP, et al); | [A]JPH04341541 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) |