EP1264829 - OXYGEN-CONTAINING HETEROCYCLIC COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.10.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.12.2005 [2005/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO CO., LTD. 6-1, Ohtemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8185 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/50] | For all designated states KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO CO., LTD. 6-1, Ohtemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8185 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OHSHIMA, Etsuo 1188, Shimotogari, Nagaizumi-cho Sunto-gun, Shizuoka 411-8 / JP | 02 /
YANAGAWA, Koji 1188, Shimotogari, Nagaizumi-cho Sunto-gun, Shizuoka 411-8 / JP | 03 /
MANABE, Haruhiko 1188, Shimotogari, Nagaizumi-cho Sunto-gun, Shizuoka 411-8 / JP | 04 /
MIKI, Ichiro 1188, Shimotogari, Nagaizumi-cho Sunto-gun, Shizuoka 411-8 / JP | 05 /
MASUDA, Yoshiaki 1188, Shimotogari, Nagaizumi-cho Sunto-gun, Shizuoka 411-8 / JP | [2002/50] | Representative(s) | Casalonga, Axel, et al Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 73 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/50] | Casalonga, Axel, et al BUREAU D.A. CASALONGA - JOSSE Paul-Heyse-Strasse 33 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01908240.3 | 02.03.2001 | [2002/50] | WO2001JP01611 | Priority number, date | JP20000057381 | 02.03.2000 Original published format: JP 2000057381 | [2002/50] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0164666 | Date: | 07.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1264829 | Date: | 11.12.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.09.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.09.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C07D319/18, C07D401/04, C07D405/04, C07D407/08, A61K31/357, A61K31/453, A61P43/00, A61P11/06, A61P37/08, A61P17/00, C07D407/04, C07D405/08 | [2003/25] | CPC: |
C07D405/08 (EP,US);
A61K31/357 (EP,US);
A61K31/453 (EP,US);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/16 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/02 (EP);
A61P9/04 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2002/50] | C07D319/18, C07D401/04, C07D405/04, C07D407/08, A61K31/357, A61K31/453, A61P43/00, A61P11/06, A61P37/08, A61P17/00, A61P27/16, A61P13/12, A61P11/00, A61P29/00, A61P19/02, A61P25/00, A61P17/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SAUERSTOFF-ENTHALTENDE HETEROZYKLEN | [2002/50] | English: | OXYGEN-CONTAINING HETEROCYCLIC COMPOUNDS | [2002/50] | French: | COMPOSES HETEROCYCLIQUES CONTENANT DE L'OXYGENE | [2002/50] | Entry into regional phase | 02.10.2002 | Translation filed | 02.10.2002 | National basic fee paid | 02.10.2002 | Search fee paid | 02.10.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.10.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.09.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 02.10.2002 | Examination requested [2002/50] | 16.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 04.07.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/49] | 27.07.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2005 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]WO9822455 (KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO KK [JP], et al); | [A]JPH10147585 (KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO KK); | [XP]WO0014085 (KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO KK [JP], et al); | [XP]JP2000319166 (KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO KK) |