EP1255959 - FIREARM SILENCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.06.2009 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rosberg, Odd Helge Padlane 30 5570 Aksdal / NO | For all designated states Hausken, Hans Petter Forland 5570 Aksdal / NO | [2003/13] |
Former [2002/46] | For all designated states Rosberg, Odd Helge Padlane 30 5570 Aksdal / NO | ||
For all designated states Dueland, Bent Arild 5567 Skjoldastraumen / NO | |||
For all designated states Hausken, Hans Petter Forland 5570 Aksdal / NO | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAUSKEN, Hans, Petter Forland N-5570 Aksdal / NO | [2008/15] |
Former [2002/46] | 01 /
HAUSKEN, Hans, Petter F rland N-5570 Aksdal / NO | Representative(s) | Wagner, Karl Heinz Zacco Sweden AB Valhallavägen 117 Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/46] | Wagner, Karl Heinz H. Wagner & Co. AB Norra Vallgatan 72 211 22 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 01908481.3 | 15.02.2001 | [2002/46] | WO2001NO00053 | Priority number, date | NO20000000755 | 15.02.2000 Original published format: NO 20000755 | [2002/46] | Filing language | NO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0161269 | Date: | 23.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1255959 | Date: | 13.11.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1255959 | Date: | 20.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 23.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F41A21/30, F41A21/18 | [2008/15] | CPC: |
F41A21/30 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/46] | F41A21/30, // F41A21/18 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/46] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHALLDAMPFER FUR FEUERWAFFEN | [2002/46] | English: | FIREARM SILENCER | [2002/46] | French: | SILENCIEUX D'ARME A FEU | [2002/46] | Entry into regional phase | 28.08.2002 | Translation filed | 27.08.2002 | National basic fee paid | 27.08.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.08.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.08.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 28.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/46] | 27.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2005 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   24.08.2005 | 28.02.2006 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   30.05.2006 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.08.2008 | BE | 20.08.2008 | CY | 20.08.2008 | DK | 20.08.2008 | IT | 20.08.2008 | NL | 20.08.2008 | TR | 20.08.2008 | GR | 21.11.2008 | ES | 01.12.2008 | PT | 20.01.2009 | IE | 15.02.2009 | LU | 15.02.2009 | CH | 28.02.2009 | LI | 28.02.2009 | MC | 28.02.2009 | FR | 02.03.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/21] | AT | 20.08.2008 | |
BE | 20.08.2008 | ||
DK | 20.08.2008 | ||
IT | 20.08.2008 | ||
NL | 20.08.2008 | ||
GR | 21.11.2008 | ||
ES | 01.12.2008 | ||
PT | 20.01.2009 | ||
IE | 15.02.2009 | ||
LU | 15.02.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
FR | 02.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/47] | AT | 20.08.2008 | |
BE | 20.08.2008 | ||
DK | 20.08.2008 | ||
IT | 20.08.2008 | ||
NL | 20.08.2008 | ||
GR | 21.11.2008 | ||
ES | 01.12.2008 | ||
PT | 20.01.2009 | ||
IE | 15.02.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
FR | 02.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | AT | 20.08.2008 | |
BE | 20.08.2008 | ||
DK | 20.08.2008 | ||
IT | 20.08.2008 | ||
NL | 20.08.2008 | ||
ES | 01.12.2008 | ||
PT | 20.01.2009 | ||
IE | 15.02.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
FR | 02.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 20.08.2008 | |
BE | 20.08.2008 | ||
DK | 20.08.2008 | ||
IT | 20.08.2008 | ||
NL | 20.08.2008 | ||
ES | 01.12.2008 | ||
PT | 20.01.2009 | ||
IE | 15.02.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 20.08.2008 | |
BE | 20.08.2008 | ||
DK | 20.08.2008 | ||
IT | 20.08.2008 | ||
NL | 20.08.2008 | ||
ES | 01.12.2008 | ||
PT | 20.01.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/42] | AT | 20.08.2008 | |
BE | 20.08.2008 | ||
DK | 20.08.2008 | ||
IT | 20.08.2008 | ||
NL | 20.08.2008 | ||
ES | 01.12.2008 | ||
PT | 20.01.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/39] | AT | 20.08.2008 | |
BE | 20.08.2008 | ||
DK | 20.08.2008 | ||
IT | 20.08.2008 | ||
NL | 20.08.2008 | ||
ES | 01.12.2008 | ||
PT | 20.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/25] | AT | 20.08.2008 | |
BE | 20.08.2008 | ||
DK | 20.08.2008 | ||
NL | 20.08.2008 | ||
ES | 01.12.2008 | ||
PT | 20.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/19] | AT | 20.08.2008 | |
BE | 20.08.2008 | ||
DK | 20.08.2008 | ||
NL | 20.08.2008 | ||
ES | 01.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/16] | AT | 20.08.2008 | |
NL | 20.08.2008 | ||
ES | 01.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | NL | 20.08.2008 | |
ES | 01.12.2008 | Cited in | International search | [Y]GB299449 (ZYGMUNT WILMAN); | [Y]EP0166802 (FINN CHARLES ALBERT); | [X]US5136923 (WALSH JR DONALD J [US]) |