EP1258107 - COMMUNICATIONS MODULE AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.01.2008 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.02.2008 [2008/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robertshaw Controls Company 1701 Byrd Avenue Richmond, VA 23230 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/48] | For all designated states ROBERTSHAW CONTROLS COMPANY 1701 Byrd Avenue Richmond, VA 23230-3011 / US | ||
Former [2002/47] | For all designated states Robert Shaw Controls Company 2809 Emerywood Parkway Richmont, VA 23294-3743 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAILEY, Graham Ritter von Weingartenstrasse 8 67366 Weingarten / DE | 02 /
SHAROOD, John P.O. Box 26544 Richmond, VA 23261-6544 / US | [2002/47] | Representative(s) | Howe, Steven, et al Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/01] | Howe, Steven, et al Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2002/47] | Howe, Steven, et al Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | Application number, filing date | 01908766.7 | 01.02.2001 | [2002/47] | WO2001US03203 | Priority number, date | US20000511313 | 23.02.2000 Original published format: US 511313 | [2002/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0163848 | Date: | 30.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1258107 | Date: | 20.11.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1258107 | Date: | 21.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/28, H04B3/54, H04L12/56, H04L29/06 | [2002/47] | CPC: |
H04B3/54 (EP,US);
H04L9/40 (EP,US);
H04L12/2836 (EP,US);
H04L69/08 (EP,US);
G08C2201/40 (EP,US);
H04B2203/5408 (EP,US);
H04B2203/5441 (EP,US);
H04B2203/5445 (EP,US);
H04B2203/547 (EP,US);
H04L2012/2841 (EP,US);
H04L2012/2843 (EP,US);
H04L2012/285 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2004/21] |
Former [2002/47] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSMODUL UND KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2002/47] | English: | COMMUNICATIONS MODULE AND SYSTEM | [2002/47] | French: | MODULE ET SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION | [2002/47] | Entry into regional phase | 03.09.2002 | National basic fee paid | 03.09.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.09.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.09.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/47] | 12.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.2006 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 08.09.2006 | 30.08.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 08.09.2006 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 28.09.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 05.02.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.12.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | ID: | 01 | For: | all designated states | Date: | 07.06.2004 | ID: | 02 | For: | DE ES FR GB | Date: | 18.10.2006 | [2007/21] |
Former [2004/47] | ID: | 01 | |
For: | all designated states | ||
Date: | 07.06.2004 | ||
[2007/21] | Cited in | International search | [XA]US5335276 (THOMPSON E EARLE [US], et al) [X] 1,3,5 * abstract * * column 3, line 56 - column 4, line 11 * * column 10, line 15 - line 21 * * column 15, line 29 - column 17, line 44 * * figures 2,3,7,8,10 * [A] 4,7,12,16,17; | [A]EP0687794 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1,2,5 * column 1, line 48 - column 2, line 7 * * column 4, line 1 - column 6, line 1 *; | [XA]EP0893745 (ABB PATENT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,6-8,11,12,15-17 * the whole document * [A] 13; | [A]US5938757 (BERTSCH LUDO ARDEN [CA]) [A] 1,2,5,12,13,17 * abstract * * column 1, line 21 - column 4, line 54 * * column 5, line 9 - line 12 ** column 6, line 44 - column 8, line 23 *; | [X]WO9965219 (IREADY CORP [US]) [X] 1,4 * abstract * * page 18, line 28 - page 19, line 10 * * page 25, line 4 - line 14 * * claims 16,19,38 *; | [A]US6005476 (VALIULIS CARL [US]) [A] 1-3,7,12,13,16,17 * abstract * * column 1, line 6 - line 65 * * column 7, line 43 - column 9, line 43 * * column 10, line 6 - line 21 * |