EP1254226 - INHIBITORS OF APOPTOSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.01.2004 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.02.2004 [2004/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/45] | For all designated states THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA 12th Floor, 1111 Franklin Street Oakland, California 94607-5200 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAEDA, Susumu Deceased / US | 02 /
HAMMOCK, Bruce, D. 3134 Chesapeake Bay Avenue Davis, CA 95616 / US | 03 /
HUANG, Qihong 10944 Caminito Alvarez San Diego, CA 92126 / US | 04 /
MAEDA, Hiroko EM 700 Elmwood Drive Davis, CA 95616 / US | [2003/10] |
Former [2002/45] | 01 /
MAEDA, Susumu Deceased / US | ||
02 /
HAMMOCK, Bruce, D. 3134 Chesapeake Bay Avenue Davis, CA 95616 / US | |||
03 /
HUANG, Qihong 400 Solano Park Circle Davis, CA 95616 / US | |||
04 /
MAEDA, Hiroko EM 700 Elmwood Drive Davis, CA 95616 / US | Representative(s) | Harrison, David Christopher, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/45] | Harrison, David Christopher, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 01908973.9 | 07.02.2001 | [2002/45] | WO2001US04071 | Priority number, date | US20000502528 | 10.02.2000 Original published format: US 502528 | [2002/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0159108 | Date: | 16.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/33] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1254226 | Date: | 06.11.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/12, C12N15/82, C07K14/47, C07K14/435, C12N5/10, C12Q1/68, G01N33/533, G01N33/68, A01H5/00 | [2002/45] | CPC: |
C12N15/8263 (EP,US);
C07K14/43563 (EP,US);
C07K14/4747 (EP,US);
C12N2799/026 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/45] | Extension states | AL | 16.08.2002 | LT | 16.08.2002 | LV | 16.08.2002 | MK | 16.08.2002 | RO | 16.08.2002 | SI | 16.08.2002 | Title | German: | APOPTOSEINHIBITOREN | [2002/45] | English: | INHIBITORS OF APOPTOSIS | [2002/45] | French: | INHIBITEURS D'APOPTOSE | [2002/45] | Entry into regional phase | 16.08.2002 | National basic fee paid | 16.08.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.08.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.07.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/45] | 01.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.08.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/09] | 19.09.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9853091 (BURNHAM INST [US]) [X] 24 * abstract *; | [A]WO9854961 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [A] 21,22 * example 8 *; | [XY] - SESHAGIRI SOMASEKAR ET AL, "Baculovirus-based genetic screen for antiapoptotic genes identifies a novel IAP.", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (19991217), vol. 274, no. 51, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 36769 - 36773, XP002187191 [X] 27,28 * abstract * [Y] 1-23,25,26 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.274.51.36769 | [XY] - AHMAD MANZOOR ET AL, "Spodoptera frugiperda caspase-1, a novel insect death protease that cleaves the nuclear immunophilin FKBP46, is the target of the baculovirus antiapoptotic protein p35.", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (1997), vol. 272, no. 3, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 1421 - 1424, XP002187192 [X] 24 * abstract * [Y] 1-23,25,26 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.272.3.1421 | [PX] - HUANG QIHONG ET AL, "Evolutionary conservation of apoptosis mechanisms: Lepidopteran and baculoviral inhibitor of apoptosis proteins are inhibitors of mammalian caspase-9.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES, Feb. 15, 2000, (20000215), vol. 97, no. 4, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 1427 - 1432, XP002187193 [PX] 1-18,23-26 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.97.4.1427 |