Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
05.09.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.10.2003 [2003/43] |
09.04.2003 | Change - extension states | |
12.03.2003 | Renewal fee | |
04.10.2002 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 20.11.2002 [2002/47] |
04.10.2002 | Request for examination filed | published on 20.11.2002 [2002/47] |
21.09.2002 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
26.08.2002 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
23.08.2002 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
16.11.2001 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
23.08.2001 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
20.08.2001 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
28.03.2001 | PCT data prior to European publication |