EP1257289 - IMMUNOTHERAPY USING INTERLEUKIN 13 RECEPTOR SUBUNIT ALPHA 2 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.09.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.10.2003 [2003/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PENN STATE RESEARCH FOUNDATION 304 Old Main University Park, PA 16802 / US | [2002/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEBINSKI, Waldemar 231 Cedar Avenue Hershey, PA 17033-1517 / US | [2002/47] | Representative(s) | Kupecz, Arpad Octrooibureau Los en Stigter B.V. P.O. Box 20052 1000 HB Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2002/47] | Kupecz, Arpad Octrooibureau Los en Stigter B.V. Postbox 20052 1000 HB Amsterdam / NL | Application number, filing date | 01909106.5 | 08.02.2001 | [2002/47] | WO2001US04384 | Priority number, date | US20000181000P | 08.02.2000 Original published format: US 181000 P | [2002/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0158479 | Date: | 16.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1257289 | Date: | 20.11.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/00, A61K39/395, A01N43/04, C07K1/00, C07K16/00 | [2002/47] | CPC: |
C07K14/7155 (EP,US);
A61K39/001184 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07K16/2866 (EP,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US);
A61K2039/5156 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/47] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | IMMUNTHERAPIE UNTER VERWENDUNG DER ALPHA-UNTEREINHEIT DES INTERLEUKIN-13 REZEPTORS | [2002/47] | English: | IMMUNOTHERAPY USING INTERLEUKIN 13 RECEPTOR SUBUNIT ALPHA 2 | [2002/47] | French: | UTILISATION DU RECEPTEUR DE L'INTERLEUKINE 13, SOUS-UNITE ALPHA 2, DANS L'IMMUNOTHERAPIE | [2002/47] | Entry into regional phase | 09.09.2002 | National basic fee paid | 09.09.2002 | Search fee paid | 09.09.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.09.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.08.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 09.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/47] | 01.09.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5710023 (COLLINS MARY [US], et al); | [Y]US5827703 (DEBS ROBERT JAMES [US], et al); | [Y]US5855866 (THORPE PHILIP E [US], et al); |