EP1261339 - USE OF N-SUBSTITUTED-1,5-DIDEOXY-1,5-IMINO-D-GLUCITOL COMPOUNDS FOR TREATING HEPATITIS VIRUS INFECTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.01.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pharmacia Corporation P.O. Box 5110 Chicago, IL 60680-9899 / US | [2002/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MUELLER, Richard, A. 562 Stonegate Terrace Glencoe, IL 60022 / US | 02 /
BRYANT, Martin, L. 1664 Clay Drive Los Altos, CA 94024 / US | [2002/49] | Representative(s) | Albrecht, Thomas, et al Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Albrecht, Thomas, et al Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/49] | Albrecht, Thomas, Dr., et al Kraus & Weisert, Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01909153.7 | 13.02.2001 | [2002/49] | WO2001US04512 | Priority number, date | US20000182362P | 14.02.2000 Original published format: US 182362 P | [2002/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0160366 | Date: | 23.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1261339 | Date: | 04.12.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/445, A61P31/14 | [2002/49] | CPC: |
A61K31/445 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P31/14 (EP);
A61P31/20 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/445, A61K2300/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/49] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON N-SUBSTITUIERTEN 1,5-DIDEOXY-1,5-IMINO-D-GLUCITOLVERBINDUNGEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON HEPATITISVIRUSINFEKTIONEN | [2002/49] | English: | USE OF N-SUBSTITUTED-1,5-DIDEOXY-1,5-IMINO-D-GLUCITOL COMPOUNDS FOR TREATING HEPATITIS VIRUS INFECTIONS | [2002/49] | French: | UTILISATION DE COMPOSES 1,5-DIDESOXY-1,5-IMINO-D-GLUCITOL i N /i -SUBSTITUES POUR LE TRAITEMENT DES INFECTIONS PAR UN VIRUS D'HEPATITE | [2002/49] | Entry into regional phase | 14.08.2002 | National basic fee paid | 14.08.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.08.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.08.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/49] | 05.12.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/09] | 30.09.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9519172 (SEARLE & CO [US], et al) [X] 1-180 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9835685 (SEARLE & CO [US], et al) [X] 1-180 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9929321 (UNIV OXFORD [GB], et al) [X] 1-180 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9940916 (SEARLE & CO [US], et al) [X] 1-180 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO0047198 (SEARLE & CO [US], et al) [PX] 1-180* the whole document *; | [XD] - BLOCK T M ET AL, "SECRETION OF HUMAN HEPATITIS B VIRUS IS INHIBITED BY THE IMINO SUGAR N-BUTYLDEOXYNOJIRIMYCIN", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA,NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE. WASHINGTON,US, (199403), vol. 91, no. 6, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 2235 - 2239, XP000952542 [XD] 1-180 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.91.6.2235 | [X] - ZITZMANN N ET AL, "IMINO SUGARS INHIBIT THE FORMATION AND SECRETION OF BOVINE VIRAL DIARRHEA VIRUS, A PESTIVIRUS MODEL OF HEPATITIS C VIRUS: IMPLICATIONS FOR THE DEVELOPMENT OF BROAD SPECTRUM ANTI-HEPATITIS VIRUS AGENTS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA,NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE. WASHINGTON,US, (1999), vol. 96, no. 21, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 11878 - 11882, XP000952534 [X] 1-90 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.96.21.11878 | [X] - PLATT F M ET AL, "N-BUTYLDEOXYNOJIRIMYCIN IS A NOVEL INHIBITOR OF GLYCOLIPID BIOSYNTHESIS. SECRETION OF HUMAN HEPATITIS B VIRUS IS INHIBITED BY THE IMINO SUGAR N-BUTYLDEOXYNOJIRIMYCIN", CHEMTRACTS ORGANIC CHEMISTRY,US,DATA TRACE CHEMISTRY PUBLISHERS, (1994), ISSN 0895-4445, pages 106 - 107, XP002067581 [X] 1-180 * the whole document * | [X] - BLOCK T M ET AL, "TREATMENT OF CHRONIC HEPADNAVIRUS INFECTION IN A WOODCHUCK ANIMAL MODEL WITH AN INHIBITOR OF PROTEIN FOLDING AND TRAFFICKING", NATURE MEDICINE,NATURE PUBLISHING, CO,US, (199805), vol. 4, no. 5, ISSN 1078-8956, pages 610 - 614, XP000979520 [X] 1-180 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nm0598-610 |