EP1264075 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR STIMULATION OF MULTIPLE FORMATION INTERVALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.04.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.05.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.04.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.11.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2019 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 26.06.2019 [2019/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ExxonMobil Upstream Research Company 22777 Springwoods Village Parkway Spring TX 77389 / US | [2015/50] |
Former [2002/50] | For all designated states ExxonMobil Upstream Research Company P.O. Box 2189 Houston, TX 77252-2189 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOLMAN, Randy C. 1903 Magnolia Esatates Dr. Spring, TX 77386 / US | 02 /
CARLSON, Lawrence, O. 15018 Redbud Leaf Lane Cypress, TX 77429 / US | 03 /
KINISON, David, A. 3326 Three Pines Drive Kingwood, TX 77339 / US | 04 /
NYGAARD, Kris, J. 4019 Tartan Lane Houston, TX 77025 / US | 05 /
GOSS, Glenn, S. 1630 Scenic Mountain Court Kingwood, TX 77345 / US | 06 /
SOREM, William, A. 20606 Fawnbrook Court Katy, TX 77450 / US | 07 /
SHAFER, Lee L. P.O. Box 680 5 Golpher Ridge Lane Big Piney, WY 83113 / US | [2015/50] |
Former [2003/01] | 01 /
TOLMAN, Randy C. 1903 Magnolia Esatates Dr. Spring, TX 77386 / US | ||
02 /
CARLSON, Lawrence, O. 15018 Redbud Leaf Lane Cypress, TX 77429 / US | |||
03 /
KINISON, David, A. 3326 Three Pines Drive Kingwood, TX 77339 / US | |||
04 /
NYGAARD, Kris, J. 4019 Tartan Lane Houston, TX 77025 / US | |||
05 /
GOSS, Glenn, S. 1630 Scenic Mountain Court Kingwood, TX 77345 / US | |||
06 /
SOREM, William, A. 20606 Fawnbrook Court Katy, TX 77450 / US | |||
07 /
SHAFER, Lee L. P.O. Box 680, 5 Golpher Ridge Lane Big Piney, WY 83113 / US | |||
Former [2002/50] | 01 /
TOLMAN, Randy C. P.O. Box 4097, 11 Meadow Canyon Dr. Marbleton, WY 83113 / US | ||
02 /
CARLSON, Lawrence, O. 15018 Redbud Leaf Lane Cypress, TX 77429 / US | |||
03 /
KINISON, David, A. 3326 Three Pines Drive Kingwood, TX 77339 / US | |||
04 /
NYGAARD, Kris, J. 4019 Tartan Lane Houston, TX 77025 / US | |||
05 /
GOSS, Glenn, S. 1630 Scenic Mountain Court Kingwood, TX 77345 / US | |||
06 /
SOREM, William, A. 20606 Fawnbrook Court Katy, TX 77450 / US | |||
07 /
SHAFER, Lee L. P.O. Box 680, 5 Golpher Ridge Lane Big Piney, WY 83113 / US | Representative(s) | ExxonMobil Chemical Europe LLC IP Law Europe Hermeslaan 2 1831 Machelen / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/25] | ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc. IP Law Europe Hermeslaan 2 1831 Machelen / BE | ||
Former [2002/50] | Troch, Geneviève ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc., P.O. Box 105 1830 Machelen / BE | Application number, filing date | 01909197.4 | 14.02.2001 | [2002/50] | WO2001US04635 | Priority number, date | US20000182687P | 15.02.2000 Original published format: US 182687 P | US20000244258P | 30.10.2000 Original published format: US 244258 P | [2002/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0161146 | Date: | 23.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1264075 | Date: | 11.12.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1264075 | Date: | 20.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.08.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | E21B33/124, E21B33/129, E21B43/119, E21B43/267, E21B43/11 | [2004/33] | CPC: |
E21B43/11 (EP);
E21B23/001 (EP);
E21B23/14 (EP);
E21B33/12 (EP);
E21B43/14 (EP);
E21B43/25 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2002/50] | E21B33/124, E21B33/129, E21B43/119, E21B43/267 | Designated contracting states | DE, DK, GB, IT, NL [2018/25] |
Former [2004/20] | DE, DK, GB, IT, NL | ||
Former [2002/50] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM STIMULIEREN VON MEHREREN FORMATIONSABSCHNITTEN | [2017/49] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR STIMULATION OF MULTIPLE FORMATION INTERVALS | [2002/50] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE STIMULATION DE PLUSIEURS INTERVALLES DE FORMATION | [2002/50] |
Former [2002/50] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM STIMULIEREN UND MANIPULIEREN VON FORMATIONSABSCHNITTEN | Entry into regional phase | 13.09.2002 | National basic fee paid | 13.09.2002 | Search fee paid | 13.09.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.09.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 13.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/50] | 19.09.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.10.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 30.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.08.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 19.03.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.04.2018 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 12.04.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP10185217.6 / EP2282002 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.03.2005 | Opposition(s) | 21.03.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/22] | Request for further processing for: | 30.11.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 30.11.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.12.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 09.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 08.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 08.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 07.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 07.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 07.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 13.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 05.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 07.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 07.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 18 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 20.06.2018 | IT | 20.06.2018 | NL | 20.06.2018 | [2019/26] |
Former [2019/12] | IT | 20.06.2018 | |
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | NL | 20.06.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US3417827 (SMITH FRANCIS M, et al) [X] 1-8,10-15,17-21,23,25-27,29,30 * column 1, lines 30,50,51; figures 1,2 * * column 2, lines 21,22,33,48,53-55 * * column 3, lines 39-45,48,49,63-65,67-70 * * column 4, lines 2,7-13,20-24,26-28 * [Y] 28; | [A]US4917187 (BURNS ROBERT E [US], et al) [A] * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0796980 (SCHLUMBERGER LTD [US], et al) [Y] 28 * figure 14a * | International search | [X]US2986214 (WISEMAN JR BEN W, et al); | [Y]US3118501 (KENLEY BRENTS E); | [A]US4637468 (DERRICK JOHN M [US]); | [Y]US5353875 (SCHULTZ ROGER L [US], et al); | [A]US5890536 (NIERODE DALE E [US], et al); | [A]US5954133 (ROSS COLBY M [US]) |