EP1248835 - GENETICALLY MODIFIED FIBROBLAST CELL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.12.2008 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.01.2009 [2009/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deutsches Krebsforschungszentrum Stiftung des öffentlichen Rechts Im Neuenheimer Feld 280 69120 Heidelberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/42] | For all designated states Deutsches Krebsforschungszentrum Stiftung des öffentlichen Rechts Im Neuenheimer Feld 280 69120 Heidelberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANGEL, Peter Am Hang 7 69181 Leimen / DE | 02 /
FUSENIG, Norbert Am Pferchelhang 32 69118 Heidelberg / DE | 03 /
KOLBUS, Andrea Am Kehler Tor 3 76437 Rastatt / DE | 04 /
SCHORPP-KISTNER, Marina Weidenweg 4 76448 Durmersheim / DE | 05 /
SZABOWSKI, Axel Am Schlierbachhang 62 69118 Heidelberg / DE | 06 /
MAAS-SZABOWSKI, Nicole Am Schliebachhang 62 69118 Heidelberg / DE | 07 /
ANDRECHT, Sven Ortenauer Strasse 4 69126 Heidelberg / DE | [2003/07] |
Former [2002/42] | 01 /
ANGEL, Peter Schillerstrasse 18 76344 Eggenstein / DE | ||
02 /
FUSENIG, Norbert Am Pferchelhang 32 69118 Heidelberg / DE | |||
03 /
KOLBUS, Andrea Am Kehler Tor 3 76437 Rastatt / DE | |||
04 /
SCHORPP-KISTNER, Marina Weidenweg 4 76448 Durmersheim / DE | |||
05 /
SZABOWSKI, Axel Am Schlierbachhang 62 69118 Heidelberg / DE | |||
06 /
MAAS-SZABOWSKI, Nicole Am Schliebachhang 62 69118 Heidelberg / DE | |||
07 /
ANDRECHT, Sven Ortenauer Strasse 4 69126 Heidelberg / DE | Representative(s) | Schüssler, Andrea Kanzlei Huber & Schüssler Truderinger Strasse 246 81825 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/42] | Schüssler, Andrea, Dr. Kanzlei Huber & Schüssler Truderinger Strasse 246 81825 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01909465.5 | 12.01.2001 | [2002/42] | WO2001DE00131 | Priority number, date | DE2000111926 | 14.01.2000 Original published format: DE 10011926 | [2002/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0151619 | Date: | 19.07.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/29] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1248835 | Date: | 16.10.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.07.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/10, C12Q1/02, C12Q1/68, A61K39/395, A61K48/00, A61P17/00 | [2008/16] | CPC: |
C12N5/0656 (EP,US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61K48/00 (EP,US);
C12N2503/02 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2002/42] | C12N5/10, C12Q1/02, C12Q1/68, A61K39/395, A61K48/00, A61P17/00, // C12N15:63 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/42] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GENETISCH VERÄNDERTE FIBROBLASTENZELLEN | [2002/42] | English: | GENETICALLY MODIFIED FIBROBLAST CELL | [2002/42] | French: | FIBROBLASTE GENETIQUEMENT MODIFIE | [2002/42] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 06.08.2002 | National basic fee paid | 06.08.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.08.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.08.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/42] | 08.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.07.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/04] | 03.09.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2009/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2007 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   31.07.2007 | 31.01.2008 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [PX]EP1055366 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INT [DE]) [PX] 1-4,6,10,15 * page 4, line 30 - line 47 *; | [DA] - BOSSY-WETZEL ELLA ET AL, "Induction of apoptosis by the transcription factor c-Jun.", EMBO (EUROPEAN MOLECULAR BIOLOGY ORGANIZATION) JOURNAL, (1997), vol. 16, no. 7, ISSN 0261-4189, pages 1695 - 1709, XP002174993 [DA] 1-5,7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/emboj/16.7.1695 | [A] - SCHREIBER MARTIN ET AL, "Control of cell cycle progression by c-Jun is p53 dependent.", GENES & DEVELOPMENT, (19990301), vol. 13, no. 5, ISSN 0890-9369, pages 607 - 619, XP002174994 [A] 1-5,7 * the whole document * | [AD] - SCHORPP-KISTNER M ET AL, "JunB is essential for mammalian placentation", EMBO JOURNAL, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, SURREY, GB, (19990215), vol. 18, no. 4, ISSN 0261-4189, pages 934 - 948, XP002121786 [AD] 1-4,6,8,15,16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/emboj/18.4.934 | [A] - ORLANDINI MAURIZIO ET AL, "Identification of a c-fos-induced gene that is related to the platelet-derived growth factor/vascular endothelial growth factor family.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES, 1996, (1996), vol. 93, no. 21, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 11675 - 11680, XP002174995 [A] 1,2,4,10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.93.21.11675 | [A] - SUPERTI-FURGA G ET AL, "HORMONE-DEPENDENT TRANSCRIPTIONAL REGULATION AND CELLULAR TRANSFORMATION BY FOS-STEROID RECEPTOR FUSION PROTEINS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES, 1991, (1991), vol. 88, no. 12, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 5114 - 5118, XP002174996 [A] 1,10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.88.12.5114 | [DA] - STARK HANS-JUERGEN ET AL, "Organotypic keratinocyte cocultures in defined medium with regular epidermal morphogenesis and differentiation.", JOURNAL OF INVESTIGATIVE DERMATOLOGY, (199905), vol. 112, no. 5, ISSN 0022-202X, pages 681 - 691, XP002174997 [DA] 9-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1523-1747.1999.00573.x | [T] - SZABOWSKI AXEL ET AL, "c-Jun and junB antagonistically control cytokine-regulated mesenchymal-epidermal interaction in skin.", CELL, (20001122), vol. 103, no. 5, ISSN 0092-8674, pages 745 - 755, XP002174998 [T] 1-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0092-8674(00)00178-1 | [T] - MAAS-SZABOWSKI NICOLE ET AL, "Organotypic cocultures with genetically modified mouse fibroblasts as a tool to dissect molecular mechanisms regulating keratinocyte growth and differentiation.", JOURNAL OF INVESTIGATIVE DERMATOLOGY, (200105), vol. 116, no. 5, ISSN 0022-202X, pages 816 - 820, XP002174999 [T] 1-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1523-1747.2001.01349.x |