EP1252766 - TELECOMMUNICATIONS INSTALLATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.2004 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DeTeWe Deutsche Telephonwerke Aktiengesellschaft & Co. KG Zeughofstrasse 1 10997 Berlin / DE | [2004/13] |
Former [2002/44] | For all designated states Detewe-Deutsche Telephonwerke Aktiengesellschaft & Co. Zeughofstrasse 1 10997 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIND, Volker Rüschkamp 13 24161 Altenholz / DE | [2002/44] | Representative(s) | Ninnemann, Detlef, et al Patentanwälte Maikowski & Ninnemann Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Ninnemann, Detlef, et al Patentanwälte Maikowski & Ninnemann Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2002/44] | Ninnemann, Detlef, Dipl.-Ing., et al Maikowski & Ninnemann, Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 01909528.0 | 23.01.2001 | [2002/44] | WO2001DE00319 | Priority number, date | DE2000104348 | 27.01.2000 Original published format: DE 10004348 | [2002/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0156283 | Date: | 02.08.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1252766 | Date: | 30.10.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1252766 | Date: | 14.01.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/14, H04N7/18 | [2002/44] | CPC: |
H04N7/147 (EP,US);
H04N7/148 (EP,US);
H04N7/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/44] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TELEKOMMUNIKATIONSANLAGE | [2002/44] | English: | TELECOMMUNICATIONS INSTALLATION | [2002/44] | French: | INSTALLATION DE TELECOMMUNICATION | [2002/44] | Entry into regional phase | 25.06.2002 | National basic fee paid | 25.06.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.06.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.08.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/44] | 30.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.11.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 12.11.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2003 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   15.04.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 14.01.2004 | FI | 14.01.2004 | TR | 14.01.2004 | MC | 31.01.2004 | DK | 14.04.2004 | GR | 14.04.2004 | [2007/10] |
Former [2006/51] | FI | 14.01.2004 | |
TR | 14.01.2004 | ||
MC | 31.01.2004 | ||
DK | 14.04.2004 | ||
GR | 14.04.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | FI | 14.01.2004 | |
MC | 31.01.2004 | ||
DK | 14.04.2004 | ||
GR | 14.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | FI | 14.01.2004 | |
GR | 14.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 14.01.2004 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0762763 (AT & T CORP [US]) [X] 1-6,15-17 * page 4, column 5, line 17 - page 7, column 12, line 42 * * figures 1-13 *; | [X]WO9834360 (INTELECT NETWORK TECHNOLOGIES [US]) [X] 1,7-10 * page 2, line 2 - page 3, line 28 * * page 11, line 1 - page 14, line 11 ** figures 2,5 *; | [X]WO9907143 (ALSTHOM CGE ALCATEL [FR], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6,11-16 * page 4, line 11 - page 8, line 4 * * figure 1 * |