Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
23.12.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.02.2006 [2006/06] |
02.09.2005 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
03.03.2005 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
13.02.2004 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
02.04.2003 | Change - extension states | |
13.02.2003 | Renewal fee | |
01.11.2002 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 18.12.2002 [2002/51] |
01.11.2002 | Request for examination filed | published on 18.12.2002 [2002/51] |
07.10.2002 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
18.09.2002 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
16.08.2001 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
13.08.2001 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
05.07.2001 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
05.04.2001 | PCT data prior to European publication |