EP1265852 - SUBSTITUTED IMIDE DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.12.2005 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.02.2006 [2006/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer CropScience AG Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 50 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/51] | For all designated states Bayer CropScience AG Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 50 40789 Monheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RIEBEL, Hans-Jochem Heimatstr. 1 56242 Selters / DE | 02 /
HERRMANN, Stefan Virneburgstr. 4a 40764 Langenfeld / DE | 03 /
HENSE, Achim Lingemannstr. 15 42799 Leichlingen / DE | 04 /
GESING, Ernst-Rudolf Trillser Graben 4 40699 Erkrath / DE | 05 /
KATHER, Kristian Nesselrodestr. 20a 50735 Köln / DE | 06 /
LEHR, Stefan Ricarda-Huch-Str. 38 40764 Langenfeld / DE | 07 /
ANDERSCH, Wolfram Schlodderdicher Weg 77 51469 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | 08 /
DREWES, Mark Wilhelm Goethestr. 38 40764 Langenfeld / DE | 09 /
FEUCHT, Dieter Ackerweg 9 40789 Monheim / DE | 10 /
HARDER, Achim Europa Ring 54 51109 Köln / DE | [2002/51] | Application number, filing date | 01909648.6 | 18.01.2001 | [2002/51] | WO2001EP00530 | Priority number, date | DE2000104084 | 31.01.2000 Original published format: DE 10004084 | [2002/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0156975 | Date: | 09.08.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1265852 | Date: | 18.12.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C07C257/14, C07C275/18, C07C279/32, C07C335/08, A01N37/52, A01N47/44 | [2002/51] | CPC: |
C07C261/04 (EP,US);
C07C257/14 (KR);
A01N47/40 (EP,US);
A01N47/42 (EP,US);
A01N47/44 (EP,US);
A01N51/00 (EP,US);
C07C275/70 (EP,US);
C07C279/36 (EP,US);
C07C335/32 (EP,US);
C07C2601/14 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SUBSTITUIERTE IMID-DERIVATE | [2002/51] | English: | SUBSTITUTED IMIDE DERIVATIVES | [2002/51] | French: | DERIVES D'IMIDE SUBSTITUES | [2002/51] | Entry into regional phase | 02.09.2002 | National basic fee paid | 02.09.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.09.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.05.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/51] | 02.08.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/06] | 06.09.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2005 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0418199 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [Y] 1-10* claim 1 *; | [Y]DE19924273 (BAYER AG [DE]) [Y] 1-10 * siehe Seite 60 Beispiel 312;; tables IB-1,IB-2, * |