EP1279142 - TRANSPONDER DEVICE FOR IDENTIFYING OBJECTS IN RELATION TO DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.2005 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.07.2005 [2005/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sokymat Automotive GmbH Gewerbeparkstrasse 10 51580 Reichshof-Wehnrath / DE | [2004/52] |
Former [2003/05] | For all designated states SOKYMAT ID COMPONENT GMBH Gewerbeparkstrasse 10 51580 Reichshof-Wehnrath / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FURTER, Urs En Novalette CH-1845 Noville / CH | 02 /
SULIGOJ, Eric 25, chemin des Clos CH-1020 Renens / CH | [2003/05] | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/05] | Cohausz & Florack Patentanwälte Kanzlerstrasse 8a 40472 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 01909745.0 | 13.02.2001 | [2003/05] | WO2001EP01567 | Priority number, date | DE2000106816 | 15.02.2000 Original published format: DE 10006816 | [2003/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0161641 | Date: | 23.08.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1279142 | Date: | 29.01.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1279142 | Date: | 28.07.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/077 | [2003/05] | CPC: |
G06K19/07743 (EP,US);
G06K19/07749 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2004/31] |
Former [2003/05] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | TRANSPONDER-VORRICHTUNG ZUR IDENTIFIKATION VON OBJEKTEN GEGENÜBER EINRICHTUNGEN | [2003/05] | English: | TRANSPONDER DEVICE FOR IDENTIFYING OBJECTS IN RELATION TO DEVICES | [2003/05] | French: | DISPOSITIF TRANSPONDEUR DESTINE A L'IDENTIFICATION D'OBJETS PAR RAPPORT A DES INSTALLATIONS | [2003/05] | Entry into regional phase | 26.07.2002 | National basic fee paid | 26.07.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.07.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.09.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.06.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.07.2002 | Examination requested [2003/05] | 30.01.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.05.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 28.05.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE19812636 (PAV CARD GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-4,13-17 * column 4, line 12 - line 48 * * figures 2-4 *; | [X]WO9926197 (ON TRACK INNOVATIONS LTD [IL], et al) [X] 1,13,16,17 * page 9, line 24 - page 11, line 12 * * figure 5 *; | [X]WO9409388 (PEDERSEN WILLY PALLE [ES]) [X] 1,5,6,8,12,16 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9712263 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [A] 1,18 * page 3, line 27 - page 5, line 35 * |