EP1263552 - HANDLE FOR A TWO-LIMBED TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.06.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Adolf Würth GmbH & Co. KG Reinhold-Würth-Strasse 12-16 74653 Künzelsau / DE | [2002/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DIEROLF, Andreas Im Greut 10 74547 Untermünkheim / DE | 02 /
LIESER, Karl Dornröschenweg 12 42111 Wuppertal / DE | [2002/50] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner mbB Kronenstrasse 30 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/50] | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner Kronenstrasse 30 70174 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 01909790.6 | 24.02.2001 | [2002/50] | WO2001EP02103 | Priority number, date | DE2000110674 | 04.03.2000 Original published format: DE 10010674 | [2002/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0166317 | Date: | 13.09.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1263552 | Date: | 11.12.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.09.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1263552 | Date: | 11.08.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B25G1/10, G09F3/00 | [2002/50] | CPC: |
G09F3/00 (EP,US);
B25G1/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GRIFF FÜR EIN ZWEISCHENKLIGES WERKZEUG | [2002/50] | English: | HANDLE FOR A TWO-LIMBED TOOL | [2002/50] | French: | POIGNEE POUR UN OUTIL A DEUX BRANCHES | [2002/50] | Entry into regional phase | 11.09.2002 | National basic fee paid | 11.09.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.09.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.08.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/50] | 10.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 12.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 11.08.2004 | IE | 11.08.2004 | TR | 11.08.2004 | GR | 11.11.2004 | PT | 11.01.2005 | CY | 24.02.2005 | LU | 24.02.2005 | MC | 28.02.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/20] | GB | 11.08.2004 | |
IE | 11.08.2004 | ||
TR | 11.08.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
CY | 24.02.2005 | ||
LU | 24.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2007/10] | GB | 11.08.2004 | |
IE | 11.08.2004 | ||
TR | 11.08.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
LU | 24.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2006/51] | GB | 11.08.2004 | |
IE | 11.08.2004 | ||
TR | 11.08.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | GB | 11.08.2004 | |
IE | 11.08.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | GB | 11.08.2004 | |
IE | 11.08.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | IE | 11.08.2004 | |
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | GR | 11.11.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE9112630U ; | [A]GB2274615 (MOSS PROD PTY LTD [AU]); | [X]US5426857 (LINDEN ERKKI OLAVI [FI]); | [XY]US5461765 (LINDEN ERKKI O [FI], et al); | [A]US5528834 (SEBER BRETT P [US], et al); | [Y]DE29705522U (EERENSTEIN PETER [DE]) |