EP1259162 - METHOD FOR CEPHALOMETRIC IMAGING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.09.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PaloDEx Group Oy Nahkelantie 160 04300 Tuusula / FI | [2006/26] |
Former [2005/27] | For all designated states GE Healthcare Finland Oy Kuortaneenkatu 2 00510 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2002/48] | For all designated states Instrumentarium Corporation Nahkelantie 160 04301 Tuusula / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOPSALA, Panu Nummensyrjänkuja 6 A FIN-04300 Tuusula / FI | [2002/48] | Representative(s) | LEITZINGER OY Tammasaarenkatu 1 00180 Helsinki / FI | [2002/48] | Application number, filing date | 01909858.1 | 14.02.2001 | [2002/48] | WO2001FI00137 | Priority number, date | FI20000000369 | 18.02.2000 Original published format: FI 20000369 | [2002/48] | Filing language | FI | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0160257 | Date: | 23.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1259162 | Date: | 27.11.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1259162 | Date: | 02.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 23.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61B6/00 | [2002/48] | CPC: |
A61B6/501 (EP,US);
A61B6/06 (EP,US);
A61B6/588 (EP,US);
A61B6/589 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/48] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR CEPHALOMETRISCHEN BILDGEBUNG | [2005/20] | English: | METHOD FOR CEPHALOMETRIC IMAGING | [2002/48] | French: | PROCEDE D'IMAGERIE CEPHALOMETRIQUE | [2002/48] |
Former [2002/48] | VERFAHREN ZUR CEPHALOMETISCHEN BILDGEBUNG | Entry into regional phase | 14.02.2001 | Translation filed | 18.09.2002 | National basic fee paid | 18.09.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.09.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.08.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 18.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/48] | 18.04.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.08.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 29.08.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.11.2005 | BE | 02.11.2005 | CH | 02.11.2005 | CY | 02.11.2005 | FI | 02.11.2005 | FR | 02.11.2005 | LI | 02.11.2005 | NL | 02.11.2005 | TR | 02.11.2005 | DK | 02.02.2006 | GR | 02.02.2006 | SE | 02.02.2006 | ES | 13.02.2006 | GB | 14.02.2006 | IE | 14.02.2006 | LU | 28.02.2006 | MC | 28.02.2006 | PT | 03.04.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/52] | AT | 02.11.2005 | |
BE | 02.11.2005 | ||
CH | 02.11.2005 | ||
FI | 02.11.2005 | ||
FR | 02.11.2005 | ||
LI | 02.11.2005 | ||
NL | 02.11.2005 | ||
TR | 02.11.2005 | ||
DK | 02.02.2006 | ||
GR | 02.02.2006 | ||
SE | 02.02.2006 | ||
ES | 13.02.2006 | ||
GB | 14.02.2006 | ||
IE | 14.02.2006 | ||
LU | 28.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
PT | 03.04.2006 | ||
Former [2008/40] | AT | 02.11.2005 | |
BE | 02.11.2005 | ||
CH | 02.11.2005 | ||
FI | 02.11.2005 | ||
LI | 02.11.2005 | ||
NL | 02.11.2005 | ||
TR | 02.11.2005 | ||
DK | 02.02.2006 | ||
GR | 02.02.2006 | ||
SE | 02.02.2006 | ||
ES | 13.02.2006 | ||
GB | 14.02.2006 | ||
IE | 14.02.2006 | ||
FR | 28.02.2006 | ||
LU | 28.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
PT | 03.04.2006 | ||
Former [2008/37] | AT | 02.11.2005 | |
BE | 02.11.2005 | ||
CH | 02.11.2005 | ||
FI | 02.11.2005 | ||
LI | 02.11.2005 | ||
NL | 02.11.2005 | ||
TR | 02.11.2005 | ||
DK | 02.02.2006 | ||
GR | 02.02.2006 | ||
SE | 02.02.2006 | ||
ES | 13.02.2006 | ||
GB | 14.02.2006 | ||
IE | 14.02.2006 | ||
LU | 28.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
PT | 03.04.2006 | ||
Former [2007/27] | AT | 02.11.2005 | |
BE | 02.11.2005 | ||
CH | 02.11.2005 | ||
FI | 02.11.2005 | ||
LI | 02.11.2005 | ||
NL | 02.11.2005 | ||
DK | 02.02.2006 | ||
GR | 02.02.2006 | ||
SE | 02.02.2006 | ||
ES | 13.02.2006 | ||
GB | 14.02.2006 | ||
IE | 14.02.2006 | ||
LU | 28.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
PT | 03.04.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | AT | 02.11.2005 | |
BE | 02.11.2005 | ||
CH | 02.11.2005 | ||
FI | 02.11.2005 | ||
LI | 02.11.2005 | ||
NL | 02.11.2005 | ||
DK | 02.02.2006 | ||
GR | 02.02.2006 | ||
SE | 02.02.2006 | ||
ES | 13.02.2006 | ||
IE | 14.02.2006 | ||
LU | 28.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
PT | 03.04.2006 | ||
Former [2007/10] | AT | 02.11.2005 | |
BE | 02.11.2005 | ||
CH | 02.11.2005 | ||
FI | 02.11.2005 | ||
LI | 02.11.2005 | ||
NL | 02.11.2005 | ||
DK | 02.02.2006 | ||
GR | 02.02.2006 | ||
SE | 02.02.2006 | ||
ES | 13.02.2006 | ||
LU | 28.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
PT | 03.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | AT | 02.11.2005 | |
BE | 02.11.2005 | ||
CH | 02.11.2005 | ||
FI | 02.11.2005 | ||
LI | 02.11.2005 | ||
NL | 02.11.2005 | ||
DK | 02.02.2006 | ||
GR | 02.02.2006 | ||
SE | 02.02.2006 | ||
ES | 13.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
PT | 03.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | AT | 02.11.2005 | |
BE | 02.11.2005 | ||
CH | 02.11.2005 | ||
FI | 02.11.2005 | ||
LI | 02.11.2005 | ||
NL | 02.11.2005 | ||
DK | 02.02.2006 | ||
GR | 02.02.2006 | ||
SE | 02.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
PT | 03.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/44] | AT | 02.11.2005 | |
BE | 02.11.2005 | ||
CH | 02.11.2005 | ||
FI | 02.11.2005 | ||
LI | 02.11.2005 | ||
NL | 02.11.2005 | ||
DK | 02.02.2006 | ||
GR | 02.02.2006 | ||
SE | 02.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | AT | 02.11.2005 | |
BE | 02.11.2005 | ||
CH | 02.11.2005 | ||
FI | 02.11.2005 | ||
LI | 02.11.2005 | ||
NL | 02.11.2005 | ||
DK | 02.02.2006 | ||
GR | 02.02.2006 | ||
SE | 02.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | AT | 02.11.2005 | |
BE | 02.11.2005 | ||
CH | 02.11.2005 | ||
FI | 02.11.2005 | ||
LI | 02.11.2005 | ||
NL | 02.11.2005 | ||
DK | 02.02.2006 | ||
SE | 02.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | AT | 02.11.2005 | |
CH | 02.11.2005 | ||
FI | 02.11.2005 | ||
LI | 02.11.2005 | ||
NL | 02.11.2005 | ||
DK | 02.02.2006 | ||
SE | 02.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/33] | CH | 02.11.2005 | |
FI | 02.11.2005 | ||
LI | 02.11.2005 | ||
NL | 02.11.2005 | ||
SE | 02.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/27] | FI | 02.11.2005 | |
NL | 02.11.2005 | ||
SE | 02.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 02.11.2005 | |
NL | 02.11.2005 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5058147 (NISHIKAWA KAZUO [JP], et al); | [X]US5511106 (DOEBERT MICHAEL [DE], et al) |