Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU3766901 | Global Dossier | 08.01.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US21443600 | 28.06.2000 | US23841800 | 10.10.2000 | US23841700 | 10.10.2000 | IB0100354 | 12.03.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1295266 | Global Dossier | 26.03.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US21443600 | 28.06.2000 | US23841800 | 10.10.2000 | US23841700 | 10.10.2000 | IB0100354 | 12.03.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR0111919 | 17.06.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US21443600 | 28.06.2000 | US23841800 | 10.10.2000 | US23841700 | 10.10.2000 | IB0100354 | 12.03.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2407549 | 14.09.2004 | C | CA2407549 | 03.01.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US21443600 | 28.06.2000 | US23841800 | 10.10.2000 | US23841700 | 10.10.2000 | IB0100354 | 12.03.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MXPA02011695 | 12.02.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | US21443600 | 28.06.2000 | US23841800 | 10.10.2000 | US23841700 | 10.10.2000 | IB0100354 | 12.03.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2003028435 | 06.02.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US21443600 | 28.06.2000 | US23841800 | 10.10.2000 | US25649502 | 27.09.2002 | US23841700 | 10.10.2000 | IB0100354 | 12.03.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2003028458 | 06.02.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US21443600 | 28.06.2000 | US23841800 | 10.10.2000 | US23841700 | 10.10.2000 | US25639302 | 27.09.2002 | IB0100354 | 12.03.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0201521 | Global Dossier | 03.01.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US21443600 | 28.06.2000 | US23841800 | 10.10.2000 | US23841700 | 10.10.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1265330C | 19.07.2006 | C | CN1439147 | 27.08.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US21443600 | 28.06.2000 | US23841800 | 10.10.2000 | US23841700 | 10.10.2000 |