|
09.05.2008 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.06.2007 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.04.2007 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.04.2007 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.04.2007 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.04.2007 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.04.2007 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.04.2007 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.2007 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2006 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2006 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.12.2006 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
31.10.2006 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.10.2006 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.06.2006 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
12.05.2006 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.2006 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.2006 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.2006 |
Request for change of address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.12.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.12.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.10.2005 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.10.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.06.2005 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.12.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.12.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.12.2004 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.12.2004 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.12.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.11.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
27.07.2004 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.07.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.03.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.03.2004 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2003 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
18.10.2002 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.10.2002 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
09.10.2002 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.10.2002 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.2002 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.2002 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
01.08.2002 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
23.07.2002 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.07.2002 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.06.2002 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
03.06.2002 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
03.06.2002 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
03.06.2002 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
03.06.2002 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
03.06.2002 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
03.06.2002 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
03.06.2002 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
24.05.2002 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
21.05.2002 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.2002 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.05.2002 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
10.05.2002 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.04.2002 |
Annex |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
08.04.2002 |
Annex |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
08.04.2002 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
08.04.2002 |
Submission concerning representation |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
02.01.2002 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
02.01.2002 |
Written opinion - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
02.01.2002 |
Written opinion - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
29.10.2001 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.10.2001 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
31.08.2001 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.08.2001 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
23.08.2001 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.08.2001 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
14.07.2001 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
09.07.2001 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
09.07.2001 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
23.06.2001 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
23.06.2001 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
18.06.2001 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
18.06.2001 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
18.06.2001 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
27.03.2001 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
27.03.2001 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
27.03.2001 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
12 |
|
27.03.2001 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
1 |