EP1257658 - METHOD FOR INCREASING THE GENE EXPRESSION OF TRANSFECTED GENES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.2008 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.06.2008 [2008/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIGMA-TAU Industrie Farmaceutiche Riunite S.p.A. Viale Shakespeare, 47 00144 Roma / IT | [2007/27] |
Former [2002/47] | For all designated states SIGMA-TAU Industrie Farmaceutiche Riunite S.p.A. Viale Shakespeare, 47 00144 Roma / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PISANO, C. Sigma-Tau Ind. Farmac. Riunite S.p.A Viale Shakespeare, 47 I-00144 Rome / IT | [2002/47] | Representative(s) | Spadaro, Marco, et al Studio Associato LEONE & SPADARO Viale Europa, 15 00144 Roma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2006/24] | Spadaro, Marco, et al Studio Associato Leone & Spadaro Via L. Gaurico 9/11 00143 Rome / IT | ||
Former [2002/47] | Spadaro, Marco, et al Cavattoni-Raimondi Viale dei Parioli 160 00197 Roma / IT | Application number, filing date | 01910129.4 | 09.02.2001 | [2002/47] | WO2001IT00057 | Priority number, date | IT2000RM00077 | 17.02.2000 Original published format: IT RM000077 | [2002/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0161025 | Date: | 23.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1257658 | Date: | 20.11.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1257658 | Date: | 04.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/87, A61K48/00 | [2002/47] | CPC: |
C12N15/87 (EP,KR,US);
A61K48/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/47] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ERHÖHUNG DER GENEXPRESSION DER TRANSFIZIERTEN GENEN | [2002/47] | English: | METHOD FOR INCREASING THE GENE EXPRESSION OF TRANSFECTED GENES | [2002/47] | French: | METHODE DESTINEE A AUGMENTER L'EXPRESSION GENIQUE DE GENES TRANSFECTES | [2002/47] | Entry into regional phase | 08.08.2002 | National basic fee paid | 08.08.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.08.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.06.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/47] | 26.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 23.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 10.04.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9957094 (SIGMA TAU IND FARMACEUTI [IT], et al) [X] 1-5 * page 6, line 4 - page 7, line 10 * * page 13, line 10 - page 17, line 8 *; | [Y]WO9956784 (TRANSGENE SA [FR], et al) [Y] 1-5 * page 4, paragraph 1 - page 5, paragraph 2 *; | [Y] - GADALETA M N ET AL, "ACETYL-L-CARNITINE INCREASES CYTOCHROME OXIDASE SUBUNIT I MESSENGER RNA CONTENT IN HYPOTHYROID RAT LIVER", FEBS (FEDERATION OF EUROPEAN BIOCHEMICAL SOCIETIES) LETTERS, (1990), vol. 277, no. 1-2, ISSN 0014-5793, pages 191 - 193, XP002167428 [Y] 1-5 * page 192, paragraph 4 - page 193, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0014-5793(90)80841-6 |