EP1268685 - COLOR IMPARTING COMPOSITIONS FOR INK JET PRINTER INKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 29.01.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2010 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 03.03.2010 [2010/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pitney Bowes Inc. One Elmcroft Road Stamford, CT 06926 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/35] | For all designated states PITNEY BOWES INC. One Elmcroft Road Stamford, CT 06926 / US | ||
Former [2003/01] | For all designated states PITNEY BOWES INC. One Elmcroft Road Stamford, CT 06926 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AUSLANDER, Judith 5 Hermit Lane Westport, Connecticut 06880 / US | 02 /
BERNARD, Richard, A. 255 Fillow Street Norwalk, CT 06850 / US | 03 /
ZELLER, Claude 97 Fan Hill Road Monroe, CT 06468 / US | [2003/11] |
Former [2003/01] | 01 /
AUSLANDER, Judith 52 Hills Lane Westport, CT 06880 / US | ||
02 /
BERNARD, Richard, A. 255 Fillow Street Norwalk, CT 06850 / US | |||
03 /
ZELLER, Claude 97 Fan Hill Road Monroe, CT 06468 / US | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/01] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01910398.5 | 01.02.2001 | [2003/01] | WO2001US03279 | Priority number, date | US20000496372 | 02.02.2000 Original published format: US 496372 | [2003/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0157146 | Date: | 09.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1268685 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1268685 | Date: | 31.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/35] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1268685 | Date: | 03.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.08.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C09D11/00, C09D11/02 | [2003/01] | CPC: |
C09D11/32 (EP,US);
C09D11/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/20] |
Former [2003/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FARBGEBENDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN FÜR TINTENSTRAHLDRUCKTINTEN | [2003/01] | English: | COLOR IMPARTING COMPOSITIONS FOR INK JET PRINTER INKS | [2003/01] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE COLORATION D'ENCRES D'IMPRESSION POUR IMPRIMANTES A JET D'ENCRE | [2003/01] | Entry into regional phase | 28.08.2002 | National basic fee paid | 28.08.2002 | Search fee paid | 28.08.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.08.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.08.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 28.08.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.08.2002 | Examination requested [2003/01] | 02.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
31.05.2006
22.09.2009
WITHDRAWN Francotyp-Postalia GmbH Triftweg 21-26 D-16547 Birkenwerder / DE Opponent's representative Jungblut, Bernhard Jakob Jungblut & Seuss Patentanwälte Wittestraße 30 J 13509 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/45] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
31.05.2006
22.09.2009
WITHDRAWN Francotyp-Postalia GmbH Triftweg 21-26 D-16547 Birkenwerder / DE Opponent's representative Jungblut, Bernhard Jakob JUNGBLUT & SEUSS Patentanwälte Max-Dohrn-Strasse 10 10589 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2008/33] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
31.05.2006
12.06.2006
ADMISSIBLE Francotyp-Postalia GmbH Triftweg 21-26 D-16547 Birkenwerder / DE Opponent's representative Jungblut, Bernhard Jakob JUNGBLUT & SEUSS Patentanwälte Max-Dohrn-Strasse 10 10589 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2006/27] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
31.05.2006
Francotyp-Postalia GmbH Triftweg 21-26 D-16547 Birkenwerder / DE Opponent's representative Jungblut, Bernhard Jakob Albrecht, Lüke & Jungblut, Patentanwälte, Gelfertstrasse 56 14195 Berlin / DE | 05.07.2006 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 11.09.2006 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 01.04.2009 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 01.04.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.05.2009 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 19.05.2009 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 22.09.2009 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 21.12.2009 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5605566 (YUI TOSHITAKE [JP], et al) [Y] 1-12* column 4, line 45 - column 5, line 4; examples 4,5,9,10 *; | [Y]US5766327 (MAZE ROBERT CRAIG [US]) [Y] 1-12 * column 2, lines 37-46; example 7 * * column 3, lines 50-67 * * column 5, lines 11-17 *; | [Y]US5851273 (MORRIS PETER C [US], et al) [Y] 1-12 * column 8; claims 1,8-1; table 1 * * column 5, lines 38-67 * | International search | [Y]JPS62567 (ALPS ELECTRIC CO LTD) | Opposition | US5630867 | EP1072653 |