EP1261701 - FULL-LENGTH INFECTIOUS cDNA CLONES OF TICK BORNE FLAVIVIRUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.11.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE GOVERNMENT OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, as represented by THE SECRETARY, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES The National Institute of Health, Office of Technology Transfer, 6011 Executive Boulevard, Suite 325 Rockville, MD 20852 / US | [2009/04] |
Former [2002/49] | For all designated states THE GOVERNMENT OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, as represented by THE SECRETARY OF THE DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES c/o National Institutes of Health, Office of Technology Transfer, 6011 Executive Boulevard, Suite 325 Rockville, MD 20852-3804 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PLETNEV, Alexander 12510 Village Square Terrace 302 Rockville, MD 20852 / US | 02 /
CHANOCK, Robert 7001 Longwood Drive Bethesda, MD 20817 / US | [2002/49] | Representative(s) | Van Malderen, Joëlle, et al pronovem - Office Van Malderen Avenue Josse Goffin 158 1082 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/49] | Van Malderen, Joelle, et al Office Van Malderen, Place Reine Fabiola 6/1 1083 Bruxelles / BE | Application number, filing date | 01910561.8 | 09.02.2001 | [2002/49] | WO2001US04460 | Priority number, date | US20000181490P | 10.02.2000 Original published format: US 181490 P | [2002/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0159093 | Date: | 16.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/33] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1261701 | Date: | 04.12.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1261701 | Date: | 21.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/00 | [2002/49] | CPC: |
C07K14/005 (EP,US);
A61K39/12 (EP,US);
A61P31/14 (EP);
C12N7/00 (EP,US);
A61K2039/5254 (EP,US);
C12N2770/24122 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/49] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VOLLSTÄNDIGER, INFEKTIÖSER CDNA KLON DES TICK BORNE FLAVIVIRUS | [2002/49] | English: | FULL-LENGTH INFECTIOUS cDNA CLONES OF TICK BORNE FLAVIVIRUS | [2002/49] | French: | CLONES D'ADNc INFECTIEUX DE PLEINE LONGUEUR DE FLAVIVIRUS A TIQUES | [2002/49] | Entry into regional phase | 02.09.2002 | National basic fee paid | 02.09.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.09.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.09.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.09.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/49] | 07.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 19.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP08103265.8 / EP1978027 | Opposition(s) | 22.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/53] | Request for further processing for: | 22.06.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 22.06.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.07.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.01.2009 | CY | 21.01.2009 | DK | 21.01.2009 | FI | 21.01.2009 | NL | 21.01.2009 | TR | 21.01.2009 | IE | 09.02.2009 | LU | 09.02.2009 | CH | 28.02.2009 | LI | 28.02.2009 | MC | 28.02.2009 | SE | 21.04.2009 | GR | 22.04.2009 | ES | 02.05.2009 | PT | 22.06.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/21] | AT | 21.01.2009 | |
DK | 21.01.2009 | ||
FI | 21.01.2009 | ||
NL | 21.01.2009 | ||
IE | 09.02.2009 | ||
LU | 09.02.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
SE | 21.04.2009 | ||
GR | 22.04.2009 | ||
ES | 02.05.2009 | ||
PT | 22.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/47] | AT | 21.01.2009 | |
DK | 21.01.2009 | ||
FI | 21.01.2009 | ||
NL | 21.01.2009 | ||
IE | 09.02.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
SE | 21.04.2009 | ||
GR | 22.04.2009 | ||
ES | 02.05.2009 | ||
PT | 22.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 21.01.2009 | |
DK | 21.01.2009 | ||
FI | 21.01.2009 | ||
NL | 21.01.2009 | ||
IE | 09.02.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
SE | 21.04.2009 | ||
ES | 02.05.2009 | ||
PT | 22.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 21.01.2009 | |
DK | 21.01.2009 | ||
FI | 21.01.2009 | ||
NL | 21.01.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
SE | 21.04.2009 | ||
ES | 02.05.2009 | ||
PT | 22.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | AT | 21.01.2009 | |
DK | 21.01.2009 | ||
FI | 21.01.2009 | ||
NL | 21.01.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
SE | 21.04.2009 | ||
ES | 02.05.2009 | ||
PT | 22.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/42] | AT | 21.01.2009 | |
FI | 21.01.2009 | ||
NL | 21.01.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
SE | 21.04.2009 | ||
ES | 02.05.2009 | ||
PT | 22.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/40] | AT | 21.01.2009 | |
FI | 21.01.2009 | ||
NL | 21.01.2009 | ||
SE | 21.04.2009 | ||
ES | 02.05.2009 | ||
PT | 22.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/37] | FI | 21.01.2009 | |
NL | 21.01.2009 | ||
SE | 21.04.2009 | ||
ES | 02.05.2009 | ||
PT | 22.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/33] | NL | 21.01.2009 | |
ES | 02.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/26] | NL | 21.01.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]RU2070929 (SANKT PETERBURGSKIJ NII EPIDEM [RU]) [A] 4,17-22 * abstract *; | [XY]WO9918216 (US HEALTH [US], et al) [X] 1-16 * the whole document * [Y] 22; | [A]US6010894 (BARRETT ALAN [US], et al) [A] 4,17-22 * column 2, lines 39-41; table IX *; | [Y] - MANDL C W ET AL, "Spontaneous and engineered deletions in the 3' noncoding region of tick-borne encephalitis virus: Construction of highly attenuated mutants of a flavivirus", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, US, (199803), vol. 72, no. 3, ISSN 0022-538X, pages 2132 - 2140, XP002151482 [Y] 22 * the whole document * | [A] - LEVKOVICH E N ET AL, "CHARACTERISTICS OF IMMUNOGENESIS IN MONKEYS INFECTED WITH ATTENUATED TICK-BORNE ENCEPHALITIS AND LANGAT VIRUS STRAINS", VOPROSY VIRUSOLOGII, (1981), no. 2, ISSN 0507-4088, pages 160 - 164, XP001018713 [A] 4,17-22 * abstract * | [A] - SOKOLOVA E D ET AL, "[Characteristics of neurovirulence, stability, and immunogenicity of attenuated variants of TP-21 Langat virus]. Kharakteristiki neirovirulentnosti, stabil'nosti i immunogennosti oslablennykh variantov virusa Langat TP-21.", VOPROSY VIRUSOLOGII, (1994 SEP-OCT) 39 (5) 220-3., XP001018703 [A] 4,17-22 * abstract * | [A] - IACONO-CONNORS L C AND SCHMALJOHN C S, "Cloning and sequence analysis of the genes encoding the nonstructural proteins of Langat virus and comparative analysis with other flaviviruses", VIROLOGY, ACADEMIC PRESS,ORLANDO, US, (199206), vol. 188, no. 2, ISSN 0042-6822, pages 875 - 880, XP002098290 [A] 1-16 * figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0042-6822(92)90545-Z | [A] - MANDL C W ET AL, "SEQUENCE OF THE GENES ENCODING THE STRUCTURAL PROTEINS OF THE LOW-VIRULENCE TICK-BORNE FLAVIVIRUSES LANGAT TP21 AND YELANTSEV", VIROLOGY, (1991), vol. 185, no. 2, ISSN 0042-6822, pages 891 - 895, XP001019192 [A] 1-16 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0042-6822(91)90567-U | [PX] - CAMPBELL MARY S ET AL, "Infectious cDNA clones of Langat tick-borne flavivirus that differ from their parent in peripheral neurovirulence.", VIROLOGY, (20000330), vol. 269, no. 1, ISSN 0042-6822, pages 225 - 237, XP002179932 [PX] 1-22 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/viro.2000.0220 | [PA] - PLETNEV ALEXANDER G ET AL, "Chimeric Langat/dengue viruses protect mice from heterologous challenge with the highly virulent strains of tick-borne encephalitis virus.", VIROLOGY, (20000815), vol. 274, no. 1, ISSN 0042-6822, pages 26 - 31, XP002179933 [PA] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/viro.2000.0426 | [T] - PLETNEV ALEXANDER G, "Infectious cDNA clone of attenuated Langat tick-borne flavivirus (strain E5) and a 3' deletion mutant constructed from it exhibit decreased neuroinvasiveness in immunodeficient mice.", VIROLOGY, (20010410), vol. 282, no. 2, ISSN 0042-6822, pages 288 - 300, XP002179934 [T] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/viro.2001.0846 |