13.08.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] |
10.07.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.08.2009 [2009/33] |
26.09.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] |
02.05.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.06.2008 [2008/23] |
04.04.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.05.2008 [2008/19] |
22.02.2008 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 26.03.2008 [2008/13] |
25.01.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.02.2008 [2008/09] |
18.01.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.02.2008 [2008/08] |
21.12.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.01.2008 [2008/04] |
09.11.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.12.2007 [2007/50] |
26.10.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.11.2007 [2007/48] |
19.10.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.11.2007 [2007/47] |
27.04.2007 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 30.05.2007 [2007/22] |
16.03.2007 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 18.04.2007 [2007/16] |
07.03.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.01.2007 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
23.01.2007 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
30.08.2006 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
08.03.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.05.2005 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
04.03.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.03.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
10.12.2004 |
Change - representative |
published on 26.01.2005 [2005/04] |
29.10.2004 |
First examination report |
|
25.10.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
03.03.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.04.2003 |
Change - extension states |
|
11.01.2003 |
Change - inventor |
published on 26.02.2003 [2003/09] |
13.11.2002 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
05.11.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
11.10.2002 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 27.11.2002 [2002/48] |
11.10.2002 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 27.11.2002 [2002/48] |
04.10.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.02.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.11.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.09.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.09.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.06.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.04.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|