EP1259204 - DISPOSABLE CASSETTE FOR INTRAVASCULAR HEAT EXCHANGE CATHETER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.02.2008 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Radiant Medical, Inc. 250 Chesapeake Drive Redwood City, CA 94063 / US | [2002/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MACHOLD, Timothy, R. 65 Bernal Avenue Moss Beach, CA 94038 / US | 02 /
BLOOM, Nicole, Denise 925 Guerrero Street, 11 San Francisco, CA 94110 / US | 03 /
ROTH, Alex, T. 1354 Regent Street Redwood City, CA 94061 / US | 04 /
SCOTT, Dave, J. 2435 Armstrong Place Santa Clara, CA 95050 / US | 05 /
ALEJANDRO, Jose 375 Kincora Court San Jose, CA 95136 / US | 06 /
OLIVER, Edward, A. 1120 Pond View Dr. Folsom, CA 95630 / US | [2003/09] |
Former [2002/48] | 01 /
MACHOLD, Timothy, R. 65 Bernal Avenue Moss Beach, CA 94038 / US | ||
02 /
BLOOM, Nicole, Denise 925 Guerrero Street, 11 San Francisco, CA 94110 / US | |||
03 /
ROTH, Alex, T. 1354 Regent Street Redwood City, CA 94061 / US | |||
04 /
SCOTT, Dave, J. 2435 Armstrong Place Santa Clara, CA 95050 / US | |||
05 /
ALEJANDRO, Jose 375 Kincora Court San Jose, CA 95136 / US | |||
06 /
OLIVER, Edward, A. 15910 Union Avenue Los Gatos, CA 95032 / US | Representative(s) | Parry, Simon James, et al Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Parry, Simon James, et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/04] | Parry, Simon James, et al Forrester & Boehmert, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/48] | Howden, Christopher Andrew FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01910872.9 | 16.02.2001 | [2002/48] | WO2001US05127 | Priority number, date | US20000185561P | 28.02.2000 Original published format: US 185561 P | US20000563946 | 02.05.2000 Original published format: US 563946 | [2002/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0164146 | Date: | 07.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1259204 | Date: | 27.11.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.09.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1259204 | Date: | 18.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61F7/12 | [2002/48] | CPC: |
A61F7/123 (EP);
A61B2017/00119 (EP);
A61B2017/00123 (EP);
A61F2007/0054 (EP);
A61F2007/0096 (EP);
A61F2007/126 (EP);
A61M2205/127 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/48] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WEGWERFBARE KASSETTE FÜR INTRAVASKULAREN WÄRMETAUSCHKATHETER | [2002/48] | English: | DISPOSABLE CASSETTE FOR INTRAVASCULAR HEAT EXCHANGE CATHETER | [2002/48] | French: | CASSETTE JETABLE POUR CATHETER D'ECHANGE THERMIQUE INTRAVASCULAIRE | [2002/48] | Entry into regional phase | 25.09.2002 | National basic fee paid | 25.09.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.09.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.09.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/48] | 06.11.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP07007819.1 / EP1800634 | Opposition(s) | 21.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.04.2007 | BE | 18.04.2007 | CH | 18.04.2007 | CY | 18.04.2007 | DK | 18.04.2007 | FI | 18.04.2007 | IT | 18.04.2007 | LI | 18.04.2007 | NL | 18.04.2007 | TR | 18.04.2007 | SE | 18.07.2007 | GR | 19.07.2007 | ES | 29.07.2007 | PT | 18.09.2007 | [2010/37] |
Former [2009/33] | AT | 18.04.2007 | |
BE | 18.04.2007 | ||
CH | 18.04.2007 | ||
CY | 18.04.2007 | ||
DK | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
IT | 18.04.2007 | ||
LI | 18.04.2007 | ||
NL | 18.04.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
GR | 19.07.2007 | ||
ES | 29.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | AT | 18.04.2007 | |
BE | 18.04.2007 | ||
CH | 18.04.2007 | ||
DK | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
IT | 18.04.2007 | ||
LI | 18.04.2007 | ||
NL | 18.04.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
GR | 19.07.2007 | ||
ES | 29.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 18.04.2007 | |
BE | 18.04.2007 | ||
CH | 18.04.2007 | ||
DK | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
LI | 18.04.2007 | ||
NL | 18.04.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
GR | 19.07.2007 | ||
ES | 29.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | AT | 18.04.2007 | |
BE | 18.04.2007 | ||
CH | 18.04.2007 | ||
DK | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
LI | 18.04.2007 | ||
NL | 18.04.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
ES | 29.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | AT | 18.04.2007 | |
BE | 18.04.2007 | ||
CH | 18.04.2007 | ||
DK | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
LI | 18.04.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
ES | 29.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 18.04.2007 | |
BE | 18.04.2007 | ||
CH | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
LI | 18.04.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
ES | 29.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 18.04.2007 | |
CH | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
LI | 18.04.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
ES | 29.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | CH | 18.04.2007 | |
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
LI | 18.04.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
ES | 29.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | ES | 29.07.2007 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4111209 (WOLVEK SIDNEY, et al) [Y] 14,19,20 * column 6, line 20 - line 40; figure 3A *; | [XAY]US5344436 (FONTENOT MARK G [US], et al) [X] 1-4,22-24,28,29 * column 12, line 10 - line 44; figures 8,11 * * column 9, line 56 - column 10, line 23; figure 3 * [A] 5,8,15,25,30,36 [Y] 14,19,20; | [A]GB2312736 (SPEMBLY MEDICAL LTD [GB]) [A] 15,30,36 * column A; figure 1 *; | [PX]WO0010494 (RADIANT MEDICAL INC [US]) [PX] 22,28,29* page 49, line 24 - page 50, line 2; figure 16 * | by applicant | US4941475 | US5733319 |