EP1257208 - A CARRIAGE ASSEMBLY FOR CONTROLLING A STEERING WIRE STEERING MECHANISM WITHIN A FLEXIBLE SHAFT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.04.2011 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tyco Healthcare Group LP Mailstop 8 N-1 555 Long Wharf Drive New Haven, CT 06511 / US | [2012/11] |
Former [2009/51] | For all designated states Power Medical Interventions, LLC 15 Hampshire Street Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | ||
Former [2007/36] | For all designated states Power Medical Interventions, Inc. 2021 Cabot Boulevard West Langhorne, PA 19047 / US | ||
Former [2003/48] | For all designated states Power Medical Interventions, Inc. 110 Union Square Drive New Hope, PA 18938 / US | ||
Former [2002/47] | For all designated states Power Medical Interventions, Inc. 110 Union Square Drive New Hope, PA 18938 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WHITMAN, Michael, P. 16 Pheasant Run New Hope, PA 18938 / US | 02 /
BURBANK, John, E. 106 Haviland Road Ridgefield, Connecticut 06877 / US | 03 /
NICHOLAS, David, A. 148 Cottage Street Trumbull, Connecticut 06611 / US | [2010/25] |
Former [2003/09] | 01 /
WHITMAN, Michael, P. 16 Pheasant Run New Hope, PA 18938 / US | ||
02 /
BURBANK, John, E. 106 Haviland Road Ridgfield, Connecticut 06877 / US | |||
03 /
NICHOLAS, David, A. 148 Cottage street Rumbull, Connecticut 06611 / US | |||
Former [2002/47] | 01 /
WHITMAN, Michael, P. 16 Pheasant Run New Hope, PA 18938 / US | Representative(s) | Soames, Candida Jane, et al Maschio & Soames IP Limited 30 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Soames, Candida Jane, et al Edwards Angell Palmer & Dodge Innovations LLP 10 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EZ / GB | ||
Former [2002/47] | Merrifield, Sarah Elizabeth, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 01911007.1 | 21.02.2001 | [2002/47] | WO2001US05435 | Priority number, date | US20000510923 | 22.02.2000 Original published format: US 510923 | [2002/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0162163 | Date: | 30.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1257208 | Date: | 20.11.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1257208 | Date: | 23.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/115, A61B17/11, A61B17/072 | [2002/47] | CPC: |
A61B17/1114 (EP,US);
A61B17/07207 (EP,US);
A61B17/115 (EP,US);
A61B17/1155 (EP,US);
A61B17/32053 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00039 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00398 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00464 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00473 (EP,US);
A61B2017/07214 (EP,US);
A61B2017/07278 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2905 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/47] | Extension states | AL | 08.08.2002 | LT | 08.08.2002 | LV | 08.08.2002 | MK | 08.08.2002 | RO | 08.08.2002 | SI | 08.08.2002 | Title | German: | WAGENANORDNUNG ZUR STEUERUNG EINES LENKMECHANISMUS FÜR EINEN LENKUNGSDRAHT IN EINER FLEXIBLEN WELLE | [2010/01] | English: | A CARRIAGE ASSEMBLY FOR CONTROLLING A STEERING WIRE STEERING MECHANISM WITHIN A FLEXIBLE SHAFT | [2002/47] | French: | ENSEMBLE DE SUPPORT SERVANT A COMMANDER UN MECANISME DE DIRECTION D'UN FIL DE FER DANS UNE TIGE FLEXIBLE | [2002/47] |
Former [2002/47] | WAGENANORDNUNG ZUR STEUERUNG EINES LENKMECHANISMUS VON EINEM LENKUNGSDRAHT IN EINER FLEXIBLEN WELLE | Entry into regional phase | 08.08.2002 | National basic fee paid | 08.08.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.08.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.09.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/47] | 19.12.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 10.05.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10004568.1 / EP2213252 | EP10011064.2 / EP2292158 | Opposition(s) | 24.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2003 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   14.04.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.06.2010 | BE | 23.06.2010 | CY | 23.06.2010 | DK | 23.06.2010 | FI | 23.06.2010 | NL | 23.06.2010 | SE | 23.06.2010 | TR | 23.06.2010 | GR | 24.09.2010 | PT | 25.10.2010 | LU | 21.02.2011 | CH | 28.02.2011 | LI | 28.02.2011 | MC | 28.02.2011 | [2013/44] |
Former [2013/25] | AT | 23.06.2010 | |
BE | 23.06.2010 | ||
CY | 23.06.2010 | ||
DK | 23.06.2010 | ||
FI | 23.06.2010 | ||
NL | 23.06.2010 | ||
SE | 23.06.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
PT | 25.10.2010 | ||
LU | 21.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | AT | 23.06.2010 | |
BE | 23.06.2010 | ||
CY | 23.06.2010 | ||
DK | 23.06.2010 | ||
FI | 23.06.2010 | ||
NL | 23.06.2010 | ||
SE | 23.06.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
PT | 25.10.2010 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/45] | AT | 23.06.2010 | |
BE | 23.06.2010 | ||
CY | 23.06.2010 | ||
DK | 23.06.2010 | ||
FI | 23.06.2010 | ||
NL | 23.06.2010 | ||
SE | 23.06.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
PT | 25.10.2010 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 23.06.2010 | |
BE | 23.06.2010 | ||
CY | 23.06.2010 | ||
DK | 23.06.2010 | ||
FI | 23.06.2010 | ||
NL | 23.06.2010 | ||
SE | 23.06.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
PT | 25.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | AT | 23.06.2010 | |
BE | 23.06.2010 | ||
CY | 23.06.2010 | ||
FI | 23.06.2010 | ||
NL | 23.06.2010 | ||
SE | 23.06.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
PT | 25.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | AT | 23.06.2010 | |
FI | 23.06.2010 | ||
NL | 23.06.2010 | ||
SE | 23.06.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
PT | 25.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 23.06.2010 | |
FI | 23.06.2010 | ||
NL | 23.06.2010 | ||
SE | 23.06.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/01] | AT | 23.06.2010 | |
FI | 23.06.2010 | ||
SE | 23.06.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 23.06.2010 | |
FI | 23.06.2010 | ||
SE | 23.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/49] | AT | 23.06.2010 | |
SE | 23.06.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0552050 (ETHICON INC [US]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]US5467911 (TSURUTA MINORU [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 4, line 23 - column 5, line 29; figure 2 * * figure 6 *; | [A]EP0705571 (UNITED STATES SURGICAL CORP [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document * |