EP1309746 - CONSTRUCTION FOR VARIABLY ADJUSTING THE CONNECTING ROD LENGTH AND THE CRANKSHAFT WEB LEVER OF A RECIPROCATING PISTON ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.08.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Friedrich, Rainer Thornerstrasse 7 21339 Lüneburg / DE | [2008/40] |
Former [2003/20] | For all designated states Friedrich, Rainer Auf der Bult 6 21407 Deutsch Evern / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2003/20] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2007/22] |
Former [2007/04] | Kloiber, Thomas, et al Vonnemann Kloiber & Kollegen Patentanwälte An der Alster 84 20099 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 01911448.7 | 16.02.2001 | [2003/20] | WO2001DE00542 | Priority number, date | DE2000107384 | 18.02.2000 Original published format: DE 10007384 | [2003/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0165001 | Date: | 07.09.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/36] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1309746 | Date: | 14.05.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.09.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1309746 | Date: | 01.10.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | D06C3/00 | [2003/20] | CPC: |
F16H21/30 (EP);
F02B75/045 (EP);
F02D15/02 (EP);
F16C2360/22 (EP);
F16C7/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/20] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KONSTRUKTION ZUR VARIABLEN VERSTELLUNG DER PLEUELLÄNGE SOWIE DER VARIABLEN VERSTELLUNG DES KURBELWELLENWANGENHEBELS EINES HUB-KOLBEN-MOTORS | [2003/20] | English: | CONSTRUCTION FOR VARIABLY ADJUSTING THE CONNECTING ROD LENGTH AND THE CRANKSHAFT WEB LEVER OF A RECIPROCATING PISTON ENGINE | [2003/20] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE REGLAGE DE LA LONGUEUR DE BIELLE ET DU CULBUTEUR DE JOUE D'ARBRE-MANIVELLE D'UN MOTEUR A PISTONS ALTERNATIFS | [2003/20] | Entry into regional phase | 30.05.2002 | National basic fee paid | 30.05.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.05.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.05.2002 | Examination requested [2003/20] | 28.08.2002 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 02.04.2003 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request accepted | 01.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.10.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | 27.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 20.02.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 26.04.2002 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   30.05.2002 | 26.04.2002 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   30.05.2002 | 26.04.2002 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   30.05.2002 | 26.04.2002 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   30.05.2002 | 26.04.2002 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   30.05.2002 | 26.04.2002 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   30.05.2002 | 26.04.2002 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   30.05.2002 | 26.04.2002 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   30.05.2002 | 26.04.2002 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   30.05.2002 | 26.04.2002 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   30.05.2002 | 26.04.2002 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   30.05.2002 | 26.04.2002 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   30.05.2002 | 26.04.2002 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   30.05.2002 | 26.04.2002 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   30.05.2002 | 26.04.2002 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   30.05.2002 | 26.04.2002 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   30.05.2002 | 26.04.2002 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   30.05.2002 | 26.04.2002 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   30.05.2002 | 26.04.2002 | TR   M01   Fee paid on   30.05.2002 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 26.04.2002 | M01   Fee paid on   30.05.2002 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2003 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   22.08.2003 | 29.02.2004 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   25.08.2004 | 28.02.2005 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   24.08.2005 | 28.02.2006 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   31.08.2006 | 28.02.2007 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   17.08.2007 | 29.02.2008 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   15.08.2008 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 01.10.2008 | DK | 01.10.2008 | FI | 01.10.2008 | IE | 01.10.2008 | IT | 01.10.2008 | TR | 01.10.2008 | SE | 01.01.2009 | GR | 02.01.2009 | ES | 12.01.2009 | AT | 16.02.2009 | GB | 16.02.2009 | LU | 16.02.2009 | BE | 28.02.2009 | CH | 28.02.2009 | LI | 28.02.2009 | MC | 28.02.2009 | FR | 02.03.2009 | PT | 02.03.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/21] | DK | 01.10.2008 | |
FI | 01.10.2008 | ||
IE | 01.10.2008 | ||
IT | 01.10.2008 | ||
SE | 01.01.2009 | ||
GR | 02.01.2009 | ||
ES | 12.01.2009 | ||
AT | 16.02.2009 | ||
GB | 16.02.2009 | ||
LU | 16.02.2009 | ||
BE | 28.02.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
FR | 02.03.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/47] | DK | 01.10.2008 | |
FI | 01.10.2008 | ||
IE | 01.10.2008 | ||
IT | 01.10.2008 | ||
SE | 01.01.2009 | ||
GR | 02.01.2009 | ||
ES | 12.01.2009 | ||
AT | 16.02.2009 | ||
GB | 16.02.2009 | ||
BE | 28.02.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
FR | 02.03.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/30] | DK | 01.10.2008 | |
FI | 01.10.2008 | ||
IE | 01.10.2008 | ||
IT | 01.10.2008 | ||
SE | 01.01.2009 | ||
ES | 12.01.2009 | ||
AT | 16.02.2009 | ||
GB | 16.02.2009 | ||
BE | 28.02.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
FR | 02.03.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/23] | DK | 01.10.2008 | |
FI | 01.10.2008 | ||
IE | 01.10.2008 | ||
IT | 01.10.2008 | ||
SE | 01.01.2009 | ||
ES | 12.01.2009 | ||
GB | 16.02.2009 | ||
BE | 28.02.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
FR | 02.03.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | DK | 01.10.2008 | |
FI | 01.10.2008 | ||
IE | 01.10.2008 | ||
IT | 01.10.2008 | ||
SE | 01.01.2009 | ||
ES | 12.01.2009 | ||
BE | 28.02.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
FR | 02.03.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | DK | 01.10.2008 | |
FI | 01.10.2008 | ||
IE | 01.10.2008 | ||
IT | 01.10.2008 | ||
SE | 01.01.2009 | ||
ES | 12.01.2009 | ||
BE | 28.02.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | DK | 01.10.2008 | |
FI | 01.10.2008 | ||
IE | 01.10.2008 | ||
IT | 01.10.2008 | ||
SE | 01.01.2009 | ||
ES | 12.01.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/42] | DK | 01.10.2008 | |
FI | 01.10.2008 | ||
IE | 01.10.2008 | ||
IT | 01.10.2008 | ||
SE | 01.01.2009 | ||
ES | 12.01.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/39] | DK | 01.10.2008 | |
FI | 01.10.2008 | ||
IE | 01.10.2008 | ||
IT | 01.10.2008 | ||
SE | 01.01.2009 | ||
ES | 12.01.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/38] | DK | 01.10.2008 | |
FI | 01.10.2008 | ||
IE | 01.10.2008 | ||
SE | 01.01.2009 | ||
ES | 12.01.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/34] | DK | 01.10.2008 | |
FI | 01.10.2008 | ||
IE | 01.10.2008 | ||
ES | 12.01.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/25] | FI | 01.10.2008 | |
ES | 12.01.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/20] | ES | 12.01.2009 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH0626359 ; | [X]US1553009 (ERNEST STUKE) [X] 1* page 1, line 43 - line 112; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US4044629 (CLARKE JOHN MICHAEL) [X] 1 * column 2, line 25 - column 3, line 63; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US5158047 (SCHAAL JACK E [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 3, line 24 - column 7, line 53; figures 1-3 *; | [X]WO9801656 (FRIEDRICH RAINER [DE]) [X] 1 * the whole document * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940506), vol. 018, no. 237, Database accession no. (M - 1600), & JP06026359 A 19940201 (MUNEMITSU ISE) [X] 1 * abstract * |