EP1265707 - CABINETS FOR HANDLING TOXIC OR STERILE MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.09.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bioquell UK Limited Walworth Road Andover Hampshire SP10 5AA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/51] | For all designated states Bioquell UK Limited Walworth Road Andover, Hampshire SP10 5AA / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DRINKWATER, James Lindsay Hollytree Cottage, Hollytree Lane, Cuddingston Aylesbury, Buckinghamshire HP18 0BA / GB | [2002/51] | Representative(s) | Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/51] | Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 01911934.6 | 15.03.2001 | [2002/51] | WO2001GB01146 | Priority number, date | GB20000006820 | 21.03.2000 Original published format: GB 0006820 | [2002/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0170398 | Date: | 27.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1265707 | Date: | 18.12.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.09.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1265707 | Date: | 05.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B01L1/04, B25J21/02, F24F3/16 | [2002/51] | CPC: |
B08B15/026 (EP,US);
B25J21/02 (EP,US);
F24F3/163 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KAMMER ZUR HANDHABUNG GIFTIGER ODER STERILER STOFFE | [2002/51] | English: | CABINETS FOR HANDLING TOXIC OR STERILE MATERIALS | [2002/51] | French: | ENCEINTES DE MANIPULATION DE MATERIAUX TOXIQUES OU STERILES | [2002/51] | Entry into regional phase | 19.08.2002 | National basic fee paid | 19.08.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.08.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.10.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/51] | 22.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.08.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 25.08.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.11.2003 | BE | 05.11.2003 | CH | 05.11.2003 | CY | 05.11.2003 | FI | 05.11.2003 | FR | 05.11.2003 | IT | 05.11.2003 | LI | 05.11.2003 | NL | 05.11.2003 | TR | 05.11.2003 | DK | 05.02.2004 | GR | 05.02.2004 | SE | 05.02.2004 | DE | 06.02.2004 | ES | 16.02.2004 | LU | 15.03.2004 | MC | 31.03.2004 | PT | 05.04.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/36] | AT | 05.11.2003 | |
BE | 05.11.2003 | ||
CH | 05.11.2003 | ||
CY | 05.11.2003 | ||
FI | 05.11.2003 | ||
FR | 05.11.2003 | ||
IT | 05.11.2003 | ||
LI | 05.11.2003 | ||
NL | 05.11.2003 | ||
TR | 05.11.2003 | ||
DK | 05.02.2004 | ||
GR | 05.02.2004 | ||
SE | 05.02.2004 | ||
DE | 06.02.2004 | ||
ES | 16.02.2004 | ||
LU | 15.03.2004 | ||
MC | 31.03.2004 | ||
Former [2007/10] | AT | 05.11.2003 | |
BE | 05.11.2003 | ||
CH | 05.11.2003 | ||
CY | 05.11.2003 | ||
FI | 05.11.2003 | ||
FR | 05.11.2003 | ||
LI | 05.11.2003 | ||
NL | 05.11.2003 | ||
TR | 05.11.2003 | ||
DK | 05.02.2004 | ||
GR | 05.02.2004 | ||
SE | 05.02.2004 | ||
DE | 06.02.2004 | ||
ES | 16.02.2004 | ||
LU | 15.03.2004 | ||
MC | 31.03.2004 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 05.11.2003 | |
BE | 05.11.2003 | ||
CH | 05.11.2003 | ||
FI | 05.11.2003 | ||
FR | 05.11.2003 | ||
LI | 05.11.2003 | ||
NL | 05.11.2003 | ||
TR | 05.11.2003 | ||
DK | 05.02.2004 | ||
GR | 05.02.2004 | ||
SE | 05.02.2004 | ||
DE | 06.02.2004 | ||
ES | 16.02.2004 | ||
LU | 15.03.2004 | ||
MC | 31.03.2004 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 05.11.2003 | |
BE | 05.11.2003 | ||
CH | 05.11.2003 | ||
FI | 05.11.2003 | ||
FR | 05.11.2003 | ||
LI | 05.11.2003 | ||
NL | 05.11.2003 | ||
DK | 05.02.2004 | ||
GR | 05.02.2004 | ||
SE | 05.02.2004 | ||
DE | 06.02.2004 | ||
ES | 16.02.2004 | ||
LU | 15.03.2004 | ||
MC | 31.03.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 05.11.2003 | |
BE | 05.11.2003 | ||
CH | 05.11.2003 | ||
FI | 05.11.2003 | ||
LI | 05.11.2003 | ||
NL | 05.11.2003 | ||
DK | 05.02.2004 | ||
GR | 05.02.2004 | ||
SE | 05.02.2004 | ||
DE | 06.02.2004 | ||
ES | 16.02.2004 | ||
LU | 15.03.2004 | ||
MC | 31.03.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 05.11.2003 | |
BE | 05.11.2003 | ||
CH | 05.11.2003 | ||
FI | 05.11.2003 | ||
LI | 05.11.2003 | ||
NL | 05.11.2003 | ||
DK | 05.02.2004 | ||
GR | 05.02.2004 | ||
SE | 05.02.2004 | ||
DE | 06.02.2004 | ||
ES | 16.02.2004 | ||
MC | 31.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | AT | 05.11.2003 | |
BE | 05.11.2003 | ||
CH | 05.11.2003 | ||
FI | 05.11.2003 | ||
LI | 05.11.2003 | ||
NL | 05.11.2003 | ||
DK | 05.02.2004 | ||
GR | 05.02.2004 | ||
SE | 05.02.2004 | ||
DE | 06.02.2004 | ||
ES | 16.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/46] | AT | 05.11.2003 | |
CH | 05.11.2003 | ||
FI | 05.11.2003 | ||
LI | 05.11.2003 | ||
NL | 05.11.2003 | ||
DK | 05.02.2004 | ||
GR | 05.02.2004 | ||
SE | 05.02.2004 | ||
DE | 06.02.2004 | ||
ES | 16.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/44] | AT | 05.11.2003 | |
CH | 05.11.2003 | ||
FI | 05.11.2003 | ||
LI | 05.11.2003 | ||
NL | 05.11.2003 | ||
DK | 05.02.2004 | ||
GR | 05.02.2004 | ||
SE | 05.02.2004 | ||
DE | 06.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | AT | 05.11.2003 | |
CH | 05.11.2003 | ||
FI | 05.11.2003 | ||
LI | 05.11.2003 | ||
NL | 05.11.2003 | ||
DK | 05.02.2004 | ||
GR | 05.02.2004 | ||
SE | 05.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/33] | AT | 05.11.2003 | |
CH | 05.11.2003 | ||
FI | 05.11.2003 | ||
LI | 05.11.2003 | ||
NL | 05.11.2003 | ||
GR | 05.02.2004 | ||
SE | 05.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/31] | AT | 05.11.2003 | |
FI | 05.11.2003 | ||
SE | 05.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/26] | FI | 05.11.2003 | |
SE | 05.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/24] | SE | 05.02.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4177718 (GROW HARRY N [US], et al) [A] 1,4 * abstract ** column 1, line 56 - column 2, line 29 *; | [XA]WO9005549 (ENVAIR UK LTD [GB]) [X] 1-3 * abstract * * page 3, line 28 - page 9, line 13 * [A] 4,5; | [A]US5316560 (KRONE-SCHMIDT WILFRIED [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * abstract * * column 3, line 44 - column 5, line 48 *; | [A]GB2286986 (MDH LTD [GB]) [A] 1-5 * abstract * * page 3, line 1 - page 6, line 9 * |