EP1254374 - METHOD FOR DIAGNOSING EFFICACY OF XENOTYPIC ANTIBODY THERAPY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.02.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.10.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.11.2008 [2008/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AltaRex Medical Corporation 8223 Roper Road NW Edmonton Alberta T6E 6S4 / CA | [2006/12] |
Former [2004/22] | For all designated states AltaRex Medical Corp. 1123 Dentistry/Pharmacy Building, University of Alberta Edmonton, Alberta T6G 2N8 / CA | ||
Former [2002/45] | For all designated states Altarex Corp. 1123 Dentistry Pharmacy Building, University of Alberta Edmonton, Alberta T6G 2N8 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NOUJAIM, Antoine 58 Wilkin Road Edmonton, Alberta T6M 2K4 / CA | [2002/45] | Representative(s) | Chapman, Paul Gilmour, et al Marks & Clerk LLP The Beacon 176 St Vincent Street Glasgow G2 5SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/32] | Chapman, Paul Gilmour, et al Cruikshank & Fairweather, 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE / GB | ||
Former [2002/45] | Hinterberg, Katherine, et al Cabinet Germain et Maureau, BP 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | Application number, filing date | 01912066.6 | 08.02.2001 | [2002/45] | WO2001IB00423 | Priority number, date | US20000181008P | 08.02.2000 Original published format: US 181008 P | US20000201868P | 04.05.2000 Original published format: US 201868 P | [2002/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0159452 | Date: | 16.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/33] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1254374 | Date: | 06.11.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1254374 | Date: | 18.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/68 | [2002/45] | CPC: |
G01N33/6854 (EP,US);
G01N33/569 (EP,US);
G01N33/574 (EP,US);
G01N2333/96455 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/45] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR DIAGNOSE DER EFFEKTIVITÄT DER XENOTYPISCHEN ANTIKÖRPERTHERAPIE | [2002/45] | English: | METHOD FOR DIAGNOSING EFFICACY OF XENOTYPIC ANTIBODY THERAPY | [2002/45] | French: | DETERMINATION DE L'EFFICACITE D'UNE THERAPIE PAR ANTICORPS XENOTYPIQUES | [2002/45] | Entry into regional phase | 08.08.2002 | National basic fee paid | 08.08.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.09.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.08.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/50] | 30.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2006 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.10.2006 | 06.10.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 10.10.2006 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 10.11.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP07007737.5 / EP1821104 | Opposition(s) | 21.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 19.07.2007 | [2008/48] | Cited in | International search | [X] - SCHULTES BIRGIT C ET AL, "Anti-idiotype induction therapy: Anti-CA125 antibodies (AB3) mediated tumor killing in patients treated with Ovarex mAb B43.13 (Ab1).", CANCER IMMUNOLOGY IMMUNOTHERAPY, (199806), vol. 46, no. 4, ISSN 0340-7004, pages 201 - 212, XP002194278 [X] 1-25 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s002620050479 | [X] - MADIYALAKAN R ET AL, "Antiidiotype Induction Therapy: Evidence for the Induction of Immune Response through the Idiotype Network in Patients with Ovarian Cancer after Administration of Anti-CA125 Murine Monoclonal Antibody B43.13.", HYBRIDOMA, (1995), vol. 14, no. 2, ISSN 0272-457X, pages 199 - 203, XP001064580 [X] 1-25 * the whole document * | [X] - QI W ET AL, "Induction of idiotype network to anti-MUC-1 antibody in breast cancer.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH ANNUAL, 89th Annual Meeting of the American Association for Cancer Research;New Orleans, Louisiana, USA; March 28-April 1, 1998, March, 1998, (199803), vol. 39, ISSN 0197-016X, page 367, XP002194279 [X] 1-25 * abstract * | [X] - REINARTZ S ET AL, "Evaluation of immunological responses in patients with ovarian cancer treated with the anti-idiotype vaccine ACA125 by determination of intracellular cytokines-A preliminary report.", HYBRIDOMA, (199902), vol. 18, no. 1, ISSN 0272-457X, pages 41 - 45, XP001064593 [X] 1-25 * the whole document * | [X] - SCHLEBUSCH HARALD ET AL, "A Monoclonal Antiidiotypic Antibody ACA 125 Mimicking the Tumor-Associated Antigen CA 125 for Immunotherapy of Ovarian Cancer.", HYBRIDOMA, (1995), vol. 14, no. 2, ISSN 0272-457X, pages 167 - 174, XP001064579 [X] 1-25 * the whole document * | [X] - KOEHLER S ET AL, "Immunotherapy of ovarian carcinoma with the monoclonal anti-idiotype antibody ACA125: Results of the phase Ib study.", GEBURTSHILFE UND FRAUENHEILKUNDE, (199804), vol. 58, no. 4, ISSN 0016-5751, pages 180 - 186, XP001064559 [X] 1-25 * the whole document * | [A] - LEVEUGLE B ET AL, "PSA-directed immunotherapy of prostate cancer.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH ANNUAL, 89th Annual Meeting of the American Association for Cancer Research;New Orleans, Louisiana, USA; March 28-April 1, 1998, March, 1998, (199803), vol. 39, ISSN 0197-016X, page 355, XP002194280 [A] 1-25 * abstract * | [A] - WAGNER U A ET AL, "IMMUNOTHERAPY OF ADVANCED OVARIAN CARCINOMAS BY ACTIVATION OF THE IDIOTYPIC NETWORK", BIOTECHNOLOGY THERAPEUTICS, (1992), vol. 3, no. 1-2, ISSN 0898-2848, pages 81 - 89, XP001053690 [A] 1-25 * the whole document * |